Gebo v. Monsanto Company
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00168 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Gebo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/05 11:35 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filed by Rebecca Dietrich(Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Willard Gebo). (Greenwald, Robin) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/03 10:39 PM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting (18074) Motion to Substitute Party and to Amend Complaint. Rebecca Dietrich added. Ron Gebo terminated. Associated Cases: 3:16-md-02741-VC; 3:17-cv-00168-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 03/19 3:18 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party SUGGESTION OF DEATH AND PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY AND TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Rebecca Dietrich. Responses due by 4/2/2024. Replies due by 4/9/2024.(Greenwald, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EX. 2 Death Certificate, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 01/16 11:29 AM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting (17669) motion to move cases to Wave 8. Associated Cases: 3:16-md-02741-VC, 3:17-cv-00168-VC, 3:18-cv-07021-VC, 3:19-cv-06026-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/22 4:00 PM
MOTION UNOPPOSED TO MOVE CASES TO WAVE 8 filed by Ron Gebo. Responses due by 1/5/2024. Replies due by 1/12/2024.(Greenwald, Robin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/19 2:35 PM
TRAVEL ORDER Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/19/2018. (djmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/24 1:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/24/2017) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 03/24 1:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/24/2017) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 03/24 1:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/24/2017) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Transcript
Fri 03/10 3:35 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/27/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Transcript
Tue 03/07 2:22 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/13 9:58 AM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:16-cv-00860. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 1/13/2017 (farS, COURT STAFF). |
|
10 | 10 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 2741 (SPB) | |
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 Case reassigned to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. New case number: 2:16-cv-860-FtM-99MRM. Judge Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (SPB) | |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ron Gebo. Related case(s): y (Smith, Christopher) | |
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by Ron Gebo. (Smith, Christopher) | |
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 PROOF of service by Ron Gebo (Smith, Christopher) | |
5 | 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/27/2016. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/12/2016. (BJH) | |
4 | 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/27/2016. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/12/2016. (BJH) | |
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (SPB) | |
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/6/2016. (SPB) | |
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number FTM010266) filed by Ron Gebo.(RMT) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |