Etter v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Referred: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00184 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
Allstate Insurance Company 3075 Sanders Road, Ste, H1A
Northbrook, IL 60062 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company of California
3075 Sanders Road, Ste. H1A
Northbrook, IL 60062 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
3075 Sanders Road, Ste. H1A
Northbrook, IL 60062 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
3075 Sanders Road, Ste. H1A
Northbrook, IL 60062 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louis Odaise
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allstate Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John C. Etter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
167 | 167
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/12 6:40 AM
FINAL ORDER ON THE FINAL STATUS REPORT ON DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS (pursuant to 166 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/12/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
166 | 166
3
pgs
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/11 11:12 AM
STATUS REPORT [FINAL] on Distribution of Funds to the Class by John C. Etter.(Kelly, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Dorothy Sue Merryman, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order |