Arvizu v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00201 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jason Duffy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karina Arvizu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Receipt
Tue 03/14 11:55 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt received from Alameda County Superior Court of remand order and docket sheet.(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 02/28 8:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Remand
Mon 02/27 12:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 5 Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Motion to Remand. The court grants Ms. Arvizu's motion and remands the case to the Superior Court for the County of Alameda. The court denies Wal-Mart's motion to dismiss as moot. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Mon 02/13 10:01 AM
REPLY filed byKarina Arvizu. (Subbotin, Kyra) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Fri 02/10 11:20 AM
REPLY filed byJason Duffy, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 02/10 11:14 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jason Duffy.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Joinder
Fri 02/10 11:12 AM
Joinder re5 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) & FRCP 21 by Jason Duffy. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Joinder
Fri 02/10 11:10 AM
Joinder re1 Notice of Removal,, by Jason Duffy. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 02/06 3:56 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Refund Status
Mon 02/06 12:32 PM
Refund re15 Application for Refund approved. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 02/03 10:45 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byKarina Arvizu.(Subbotin, Kyra) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/02 6:41 PM
NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re16 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, [Joint] Notice to the Court re Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Remand and Status of Defendant Jason Duffy (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 02/01 5:18 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler re 13 Administrative Motion. The court directs the parties to meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing and hearing schedule on the pending motions by February 3, 2017. The court also asks the parties to provide an update on the status of defendant Duffy. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Application for Refund
Mon 01/30 11:08 AM
Application for Refund, Receipt Number 2603JT9F Amended by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 01/30 11:06 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Wed 01/25 5:25 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continuance of Wal-Mart's Motion to Dismiss filed by Karina Arvizu. Responses due by 1/30/2017.(Subbotin, Kyra) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 01/25 4:01 PM
ORDER re ECF No. 9. The court directs Ms. Arvizu to file an administrative motion to change the hearing date and briefing schedule. In it, she must specify the exact relief she requests, including the new dates that she proposes. Wal-Mart will then have four days to file an opposition, if it chooses. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/25/2017. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Refund Status
Wed 01/25 9:39 AM
Refund re7 Application for Refund denied. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/23 10:17 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Karina Arvizu.. (Subbotin, Kyra) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Remand
Mon 01/23 10:11 AM
MOTION to Remand filed by Karina Arvizu. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/6/2017. Replies due by 2/13/2017.(Subbotin, Kyra) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Dec. of Subbotin and Exhs. in Support of Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Remand | ||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 01/20 5:57 PM
Proposed Order re5 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) & FRCP 21 by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Application for Refund
Fri 01/20 3:15 PM
Application for Refund, Receipt Number 2603JT9F by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/20 3:05 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc... (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Fri 01/20 2:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) & FRCP 21 filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/3/2017. Replies due by 2/10/2017. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 01/18 3:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re Notice to Adverse Party of Removal from State to Federal Court and New Case Documents (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/17 11:32 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/17 9:05 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/13 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441 and 1446 (DIVERSITY JURISDICTION) from Superior Court of California County of Alameda. Their case number is RG16842066. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11075837). Filed byWal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Juan C. Araneda ISO Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service |