Margarita Serrano v. Automotive Recovery Services, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00203 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Automotive Recovery Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margarita Serrano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/12 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE as to the Named Plaintiff, and WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the Putative Class by Margarita Serrano (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Order
Thu 03/23 4:07 PM
ORDER re 20 Stipulation. The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 5/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on March 23, 2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 03/21 3:50 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANT AUTOMOTIVE RECOVERY SERVICES, INC.'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO RESET THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Automotive Recovery Services, Inc..(Sager, Heather) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 9:16 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeanah Park. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 9:15 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Blaine Kimrey. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
17 | 17
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 02/23 8:38 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/23/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/21 10:34 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11170473.) filed by Automotive Recovery Services, Inc..(Park, Jeanah) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/17 4:55 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11168878.) filed by Automotive Recovery Services, Inc..(Kimrey, Blaine) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Admission | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/17 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany A. Sachs (Sachs, Brittany) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 02/16 2:42 PM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/16/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 02/16 9:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/15 11:11 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Automotive Recovery Services, Inc... (Sager, Heather) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 02/15 11:10 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Automotive Recovery Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ADESA, Inc., Corporate Parent KAR Auction Services, Inc. for Automotive Recovery Services, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sager, Heather) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 02/15 11:06 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Automotive Recovery Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ADESA, Inc., Corporate Parent KAR Auction Services, Inc. for Automotive Recovery Services, Inc.. (Sager, Heather) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 02/15 11:03 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Automotive Recovery Services, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Automotive Recovery Services, Inc.. (Sager, Heather) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/09 1:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Margarita Serrano.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 01/30 12:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/17 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Automotive Recovery Services, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/17 3:02 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/17 8:13 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/13 6:58 PM
Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 6:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Automotive Recovery Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11076010.). Filed byMargarita Serrano.(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |