Johnson v. Freeland et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00178 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Batia Freeland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Uri Freeland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 06/11 3:21 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice filed by Scott Johnson.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/05 3:21 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/4/2018. (cpS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 03/01 11:08 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 35 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Deadline to seek leave to amend pleadings: 5/16/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
adr
Certification of ADR Session
Fri 02/23 8:41 AM
Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Todd Roberts: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on 12/7/2017. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are expected by 3/1/2018. Mediation process is ongoing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 02/20 11:15 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re32 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, jointly filed by Scott Johnson.(Montgomery, Elliott) (Filed on 2/20/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 02/16 4:41 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 dismissing defendant Batia Freeland only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 02/16 6:39 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal, pursuant to 41 (a)(1) for defendant Batia Freeland only, jointly filed by Scott Johnson.(Grace, Phyl) (Filed on 2/16/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of service | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Case Management Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 01/16 4:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge van Keulen for Settlement Conference to take place about 1 month prior to a Final Pretrial Conference. Deadline to seek leave to amend pleadings: 3/16/2018. Fact discovery cutoff: 6/18/2018. Designation of experts with reports: 7/9/2018. Designation of rebuttal expert with reports: 8/6/2018. Expert discovery cutoff: 9/7/2018. Last day for filing dispositive motions (limit: 1 per side): 9/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/16/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) |
|
31 | 31
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial
Tue 01/16 1:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd: Initial Case Management Conference - Telephonic held on 1/16/2018. Hearing held. Court to issue written scheduling order. FTR Time: 1:38-1:47. Plaintiff Attorney: Dennis Price. Defendant Attorney: Cris Vaughn. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2018) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
Tue 01/16 5:05 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Settlement Conference. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Wed 01/10 10:39 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 27 defendants' Motion to Appear by Telephone at 1/16/2018 Case Management Conference. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) |
|
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Wed 01/10 10:36 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 26 plaintiff's Motion to Appear by Telephone at 1/16/2018 Case Management Conference. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Tue 01/09 3:42 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Scott Johnson.(Price, Dennis) (Filed on 1/9/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
27 | 27
motion
Appear by Telephone
Tue 01/09 2:47 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Batia Freeland, Uri Freeland.(Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 1/9/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
motion
Appear by Telephone
Tue 01/09 1:07 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Scott Johnson.(Price, Dennis) (Filed on 1/9/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of service | ||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 12/18 4:29 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 24 Administrative Motion for Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 12/11 8:13 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Case Management Conference Pursuant to General Order 56 filed by Scott Johnson. Responses due by 12/15/2017.(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 12/11/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of service | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 10/16 1:14 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 22 Second Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline. Deadline for mediation: 12/7/2017. Related deadlines adjusted accordingly. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 10/13 3:10 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Mediation Deadline,jointly filed by Scott Johnson.(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 10/06 8:37 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 12/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. in the Mediator's Redwood City office, located at 1001 Marshall Street, Suite 500, Redwood City, CA 94063. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 09/27 2:58 PM
ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 20 joint stipulation to extend mediation deadline. Deadline for mediation: 11/24/2017. Related deadlines adjusted accordingly. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 09/26 2:29 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend mediation deadline, jointly filed by Scott Johnson.(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of service | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/26 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Carson(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Wed 09/06 3:22 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Todd Roberts as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Fri 07/14 8:46 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, July 17, 2017, at 1:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
adr
Notice of Need for Mediation - ADA Cases Only
Wed 06/28 6:48 PM
Notice of Need for Mediation by Mary Irene Melton(Melton, Mary) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Thu 06/29 3:10 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation16 . Deadline to complete mediation is 9/26/2017. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/15 7:02 AM
NOTICE by Scott Johnson of withdrawal of counsel for Teresa Allen only(Potter, Mark) (Filed on 5/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 04/10 2:15 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 13 Stipulation to Extend Joint Site Inspection Deadline. New deadline for joint site inspection: 5/11/2017. Deadline for plaintiff's Notice of Need for Mediation: 6/22/2017. All other related deadlines adjusted accordingly. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 04/10 11:23 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Site Inspection Deadline, jointly filed by Scott Johnson.(Melton, Mary) (Filed on 4/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of service | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/10 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Irene Melton(Melton, Mary) (Filed on 4/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 proof of service | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/23 9:38 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Batia Freeland, Uri Freeland.. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 03/23 9:35 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Batia Freeland, Uri Freeland (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/23 9:34 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byBatia Freeland, Uri Freeland. (Vaughan, Cris) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/27 5:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Uri Freeland served on 2/25/2017, answer due 3/20/2017. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/16 12:33 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson..(Handy, Russell) (Filed on 1/16/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/13 3:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Batia Freeland, Uri Freeland. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Fri 01/13 3:13 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/13 7:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/13 3:24 AM
Proposed Summons. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 01/13 3:23 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re1 Complaint, (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 3:19 AM
COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11072451.). Filed byScott Johnson.(Handy, Russell) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |