Swan v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Howard R Lloyd |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00195 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jereen Swan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
utility
Remark
Tue 02/28 3:31 PM
Transmittal letter to Superior Court, County of Santa Cruz regarding remand (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 02/27 3:08 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 9 Stipulation to remand to state court. The Clerk shall close the file. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 02/24 2:19 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO REMAND TO STATE COURT filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Rowell, William) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Mon 02/13 1:57 PM
Declaration of Harold Cartwright in Support of5 MOTION to Remand filed byJereen Swan. (Cartwright, Harold) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/13 11:54 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jereen Swan.. (Cartwright, Harold) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 02/13 10:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/27/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand
Fri 02/10 4:07 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Jereen Swan. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Responses due by 2/24/2017. Replies due by 3/3/2017.(Cartwright, Harold) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/01 2:09 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CVS Pharmacy, Inc... (Rowell, William) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 01/18 9:21 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) Modified text on 1/18/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/17 12:38 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/13 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz. Their case number is 16CV00033. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11075465). Filed byLongs Drug Stores California, LLC.(Rowell, William) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service |