Beron v. Check N' Go et.al.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00197 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
CNG Financial Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Check N" Go
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
William Whitcomb Faulkner
McManis Faulkner & Morgan 50 W. San Fernando Street, 10th Floor
San Jose, CA 95113 |
|
Plaintiff
Thomas James Beron
Spiering, Swartz & Kennedy 550 Hartnell Street Suite A1
Monterey, CA 93940 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 18 2017
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/18/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 09/18 11:00 AM
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/18/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/18 10:37 AM
NOTICE by CNG Financial Corporation, Check N" Go of Settlement (Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Extending ADR Deadline ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 07/31 10:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE Continuance of Mediation Deadline 13 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/31/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 07/31 8:41 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE Continuance of Mediation Deadlin filed by Check N" Go. (Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 7/31/2017) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
adr
Pre MED phone conference
Mon 04/17 12:16 PM
Pre MED phone conference scheduled on Monday, April 17, 2017, at 1:00 PM. Mediator provided call-in information to parties. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Fri 03/31 12:56 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing William Whitcomb Faulkner as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 03/29 5:51 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference scheduled for 4/19/2017 is CONTINUED to 9/20/2017 10:00 AM; Case management statement due 9/13/2017; Deadline to amend pleadings and add arties is 4/28/2017; Non-expert discovery must be completed by 9/20/2017; All discovery of expert witnesses must be completed by 11/3/2017; Dispositive motions will be heard by 12/13/2017 01:00 PM; Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2018 02:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 3/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/29/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Wed 03/29 12:43 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Court's ADR Program for Mediation to be completed within 90 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/29/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Case Management Statement
Tue 03/28 3:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by CNG Financial Corporation, Check N" Go. (Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 3/28/2017) |
|
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 03/28 3:24 PM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/11/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 02/28 11:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/14/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/31 11:03 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Check N" Go.. (Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/18 1:05 PM
NOTICE by Southwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc. dba Check N' Go Proof of service (Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 01/18 9:47 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2017 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/13/17. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
1 | 1
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Wed 01/18 9:44 AM
Answer to Removal Complaint bySouthwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc. dba Check N' Go. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/17 12:50 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/13 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey. Their case number is 16CV002494. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11075453). Filed bySouthwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc. dba Check N' Go.(Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service |