ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00122 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
ALEX FONCHAM
|
|
Defendant
LIANNA WOOD
|
|
Defendant
JANNA RIGGINS
|
|
Defendant
ADAM PAYNE
|
|
Defendant
REBECCA MARRA
|
|
Defendant
ALETA MACHA
|
|
Defendant
MARY HOSSAY
|
|
Defendant
ADIL HARCHAOUI
|
|
Defendant
CAREY GARDNER
|
|
Defendant
GEORGE FAULKNER
|
|
Defendant
MANUEL COLEMAN
|
|
Defendant
LOUIS BASQUE
|
|
Defendant
SALOME AGUILAR
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does
|
|
Plaintiff
ME2 Productions, Inc.
318 N. Carson Street No. 208
Carson City, NV 89701 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
HECTOR NILA
Terminated: 06/26/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
misc
AO 121 Copyright Report
Wed 04/18 2:03 PM
AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (ADR) |
|
Att: 1 Default Judgment | ||
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Judgment Default
Tue 04/17 2:58 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of ME2 Productions, Inc. against LIANNA WOOD. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Proposed Order Submission
Thu 04/12 10:48 AM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re:33 MOTION for Default Judgment, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 03/26 1:47 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part33 Motion for Default Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature consistent with the foregoing within twenty-one days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Vacate Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 11/16 8:50 AM
ORDER denying34 Motion to Vacate; ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part19 Report and Recommendation; ORDER denying25 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2017.; ADAM PAYNE, SALOME AGUILAR and ALETA MACHA terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/22 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. to defendants Louis Basque, Carey Gardner, Alex Foncham, Janna Riggins, George Faulkner, Manuel Coleman, Mary Hossay and Adil Harchaoui (Rainey, Charles) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 08/23 7:48 AM
Party GEORGE FAULKNER, ALEX FONCHAM, CAREY GARDNER, ADIL HARCHAOUI, MARY HOSSAY, JANNA RIGGINS, LOUIS BASQUE and MANUEL COLEMAN terminated pursuant to36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/17 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. to defendant Rebecca Marra (Rainey, Charles) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 08/18 7:37 AM
Party REBECCA MARRA terminated pursuant to35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM) |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Vacate
Thu 08/10 5:33 PM
MOTION to Vacate31 Clerk's Entry of Default. (ADR) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 08/02 5:16 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against defendants Rebecca Marra, Lianna Wood, Adam Payne and Salome Aguilar by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc..(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1-C, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 08/02 10:05 AM
NOTICE of entry of default to defendants Rebecca Marra, Lianna Wood, Adam Payne and Salome Aguilar by ME2 Productions, Inc..(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 08/01 8:31 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SALOME AGUILAR, REBECCA MARRA, ADAM PAYNE, LIANNA WOOD re30 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (JM) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Entry of Clerks Default
Mon 07/31 12:09 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default against Rebecca Marra, Lianna Wood, Adam Payne and Salome Aguilar by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc..(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Supporting Declaration | ||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/28 5:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ME2 Productions, Inc.. REBECCA MARRA served on 6/25/2017, answer due 7/16/2017. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
28 | 28
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/28 5:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ME2 Productions, Inc.. SALOME AGUILAR served on 6/25/2017, answer due 7/16/2017. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
27 | 27
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/28 5:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ME2 Productions, Inc.. LIANNA WOOD served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
26 | 26
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/28 5:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ME2 Productions, Inc.. ADAM PAYNE served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Entry of Clerks Default
Thu 07/20 3:23 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default against defendant Aleta Macha by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc..(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Supporting Declaration | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/10 12:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ME2 Productions, Inc. re18 Summons Issued. ALETA MACHA served on 6/28/2017, answer due 7/19/2017. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Tue 06/27 8:32 PM
OBJECTION to19 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. Response to Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2017.(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/26 7:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. Hector Nila (Rainey, Charles) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 06/27 10:12 AM
Party HECTOR NILA terminated pursuant to22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Corrected Image/Document
Thu 06/22 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re20 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/20 11:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for19 Report and Recommendation,, by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 06/14 11:52 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that all Defendants except Defendant Rebecca Marra be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent any subpoenas remain outstanding in this case, they are hereby QUASHED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly serve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas, and shall file a proof of service of the same by June 20, 2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/31 12:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Salome Aguilar, Louis Basque, Manuel Coleman, George Faulkner, Alex Foncham, Carey Gardner, Adil Harchaoui, Mary Hossay, Aleta Macha, Rebecca Marra, Hector Nila, Adam Payne, Janna Riggins, Lianna Wood. (JM) |
|
17 | 17
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Wed 05/31 11:50 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/22 3:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rebecca Marra, Lianna Wood, Aleta Macha, Adam Payne, Salome Aguilar, Louis Basque, Carey Gardner, Alex Foncham, Janna Riggins, George Faulkner, Manuel Coleman, Hector Nila, Mary Hossay, Adil Harchaoui, filed by ME2 Productions, Inc.. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 8/20/2017.(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 05/18 8:09 PM
RESPONSE to10 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc. .(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Supporting Declaration | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 05/11 3:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for13 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 05/10 1:52 PM
ORDER that the recipients of the subpoenas not to provide the subpoenaed information pending resolution of the order to show cause. Plaintiff is FURTHER ORDERED to immediately serve a copy of this order on the recipients of the subpoenas, and to file a proof of service so indicating by noon on 5/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Mon 05/08 4:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on 5/8/2017. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to extend the deadline to respond to the order to show cause by 14 days. The Court finds insufficient reasons have been articulated for a 14-day extension. Instead, the Court will extend the deadline by 7 days to May 18, 2017. Accordingly, the motion to extend is GRANTED in part. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. The deadline for any defendant to respond to the order to show cause is similarly extended to May 18, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) |
|
Sunday, May 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Sun 05/07 2:39 PM
FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re10 Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/27 1:29 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. No later than 5/11/2017, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why the Court should not (1) sever all defendants except the first defendant in each case, (2) dismiss the remaining defendants without prejudice, and (3) quash any subpoenas for discovery to the extent they pertain to any defendants other than the first named defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Assigning/Reassigning Case
Thu 04/20 2:37 PM
ORDER: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:17-cv-00122-JCM-NJK. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice re 4m Dismissal
Tue 04/18 12:19 PM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The COMPLAINT in this action was filed on 1/13/2017. To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to defendant Does . FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RFJ) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Hearing
Tue 02/28 9:35 AM
MOTION for Hearing re3 Ex Parte Motion by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Copyright Form
Fri 01/13 2:36 PM
AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (ADR) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/13 10:20 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by ME2 Productions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Avi Lerner, Other Affiliate Trevor Short for ME2 Productions, Inc. added. . (Rainey, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT against ME2 Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4435759), filed by ME2 Productions, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/13/2017.(Rainey, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/13 2:34 PM
Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR) |