ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00123 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Michael Hughes
|
|
Defendant
Joana Peo Torres
|
|
Defendant
Dominick Stocks
|
|
Defendant
Savannah Ronfeldet
|
|
Defendant
Tina Phillips
|
|
Defendant
Robert Perez
|
|
Defendant
Curtis Jones
|
|
Defendant
Rocky Hollenbeck
|
|
Defendant
Sean Gipson
|
|
Defendant
Jacquelyn Dismuke
|
|
Defendant
Marc Cabrera
|
|
Defendant
Paul Abatie
|
|
Interested Party
Michael Hughes
1325 Del Mar St., #4
Las Vegas, NV 89119 |
|
Interested Party
Jacqueline R. Pieritz
1055 Amico Drive
Sparks, NV 89434 |
|
Plaintiff
ME2 Productions, Inc.
318 N. Carson Street No. 208
Carson City, NV 89701 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Teleforo Murillo
Terminated: 06/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
Pedro Montero
Terminated: 06/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does
Terminated: 05/23/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
52 | 52
misc
AO 121 Copyright Report
Fri 04/27 9:19 AM
AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (ADR) |
|
Att: 1 Default Judgment | ||
51 | 51
order
Judgment Default
Fri 04/27 9:17 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of ME2 Productions, Inc. against Savannah Ronfeldet. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
50 | 50
misc
Proposed Order Submission
Mon 04/23 11:42 AM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on49 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |