Wells Fargo Financial Nevada 2, Inc v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00125 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:35 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Wells Fargo Financial Nevada 2, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Betty A. Smith
|
|
Cross Defendant
Jack E. Smith
|
|
Defendant
Eagle Creek Community Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Financial Nevada 2, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
60 | 60
1
pgs
appeal
Order on Mandate
Wed 04/22 1:08 PM
ORDER on Mandate as to57 USCA Order DISMISSING50 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Financial Nevada 2, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
59 | 59
notice
Notice Other
Thu 04/16 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Release of Lis Pendens by Wells Fargo Financial Nevada 2, Inc re4 Notice of Lis Pendens. (Cheong, Holly) |