Cummings v. Baca et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Robert C Jones |
Referred: | William G Cobb |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00018 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment
Wed 03/28 8:50 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/28 8:49 AM
ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action based on Plaintiff's failure to file amended complaint and for failure to state a claim; denying as moot ECF No.1 IFP Application; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/29 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT by Christopher Cummings. Filed and dismissed in its entirety without prejudice per ECF No. 10 Screening Order. (LH) |
|
10 | 10
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order
Mon 01/29 2:45 PM
SCREENING ORDER that a decision on Plaintiff's IFP application ECF No.1 is deferred ; Clerk directed to file the complaint ECF No.1 -1; complaint is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice , with leave to amend; the amended complaint if Plaintiff chooses to file one is due by 2/28/2018 ; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff § 1983 complaint form, instructions for the same and a copy of ECF No.1 -1 Complaint; if Plaintiff fails to file a timely amended complaint then this action will be dismissed with prejudice. (copy of § 1983 complaint form, instructions for the same and ECF No. 1 -1 Complaint attached to this order for distribution to Plaintiff via NNCC Law Library) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/29/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint form and instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Original Complaint | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/24 11:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/24/2018, denying Plaintiff's ECF No.8 Motion for Screening Order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 01/23 7:48 AM
MOTION for Screening Order, by Plaintiff Christopher Cummings. Responses due by 2/5/2018. (DRM) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/27 2:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/27/2017. Plaintiff's Motions for Status Check ECF Nos.5 and6 are DENIED as moot . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/22 2:09 PM
MOTION Request for Status Check and Update Second Request by Plaintiff Christopher Cummings. Responses due by 1/5/2018 . (LH) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/05 2:07 PM
MOTION Request for Status Check and Updated , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Cummings. Responses due by 12/18/2017. (KW) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Mon 07/17 4:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 7/17/2017. RE:3 ECF No. Letter for Status Request (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Status request | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter for Status Request
Mon 07/17 3:56 PM
LETTER requesting status from Plaintiff Christopher Cummings. (DRM) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Inmate Advisory Letter - NOS 550 & 555
Fri 01/13 9:56 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KR) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/13 9:59 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/13 9:51 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Christopher Cummings. (KR) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/13/2017; NEF regenerated) (KR) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |