Sudberry v. Baca et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Larry R Hicks |
Referred: | William G Cobb |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00021 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Tue 09/12 8:45 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/12 8:44 AM
ORDER dismissing without prejudice this action for failure to comply with the Court's order; directing Clerk to enter judgment and close case; denying a certificate of appealability; directing Clerk to add NV AG as counsel for Respondents and serve Respondents a copy of this order (NEF sent 9/12/2017). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Thu 07/27 11:41 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.5 Motion to Extend Time. Payment of filing fees due 8/21/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Thu 06/29 2:40 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re ECF No.4 Order, by Petitioner Dennis K. Sudberry. (KW) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/05 2:32 PM
ORDER DENYING without prejudice ECF No.1 IFP application, accompanied by a signed financial certificate and a statement of his inmate account. Clerk shall send petitioner a blank application form for incarcerated litigants. (Mailed 6/5/2017.) In the alternative, petitioner shall make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee of five dollars ($5.00), accompanied by a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 04/18 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Change of mailing Address by Petitioner Dennis K. Sudberry, effective after 18April2017. Old address NNCC. New address 235 Miller County 212, Fouke, Arkansas, 71837. (DRM) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se - FORM LETTER
Fri 01/13 12:02 PM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against Isidro Baca, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:17-cv-00021 . (KW) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/13 12:00 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Dennis K. Sudberry.(KW) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Index | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 01/13 12:28 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) |