Von Tobel v. Johns et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Robert C Jones |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00022 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Aug 09, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
122 | 122
order
Judgment
Thu 03/02 3:14 PM
JUDGMENT in a Civil Case Re: ECF Nos.106 Order,121 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
121 | 121
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Sanctions
Thu 03/02 3:07 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT, AND SECOND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, AND GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL (ECF Nos.110 ,112 ,114 ,116 ) - IT IS ORDERED that Von Tobel's motion for leave to file a request for sanctions, and supplemental motions, (ECF Nos.110 ,112 ,114 ), are DENIED . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to seal, (ECF No.116 ), is GRANTED . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court ENTER JUDGMENT in accordance with the order dismissing this action with prejudice, (ECF No.106 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
120 | 120
notice
Notice Change of Address
Wed 03/01 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Gerald Von Tobel. Old address at LCC updated back to new address at NNCC. (District case no. identified by USCA case no. 20-16853 reflected on filing.) (CJS) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
119 | 119
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 02/24 9:19 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable "RTS inmate at NNCC" re ECF Nos.118 Notice,114 Motion for Sanctions,115 Response &116 Motion electronically sent to Gerald Von Tobel at Lovelock Correctional Center. (AB) |