Kelly et al v. Geico Casualty Company et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Howard D Mckibben |
Referred: | Valerie P Cooke |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00023 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Geico Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive Northern Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell Anderson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conner Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 06/16 1:27 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.25 Stipulation of Dismissal. The matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 06/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/16 9:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Pintar, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Case Management Report
Mon 04/24 1:52 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Mitchell Anderson, Jr.. (Throop, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation re Discovery Matters
Wed 04/05 3:48 PM
STIPULATION Stipulated Discovery Plan and Order by Plaintiff Mitchell Anderson, Jr.. (Throop, Julie) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing
Thu 03/16 1:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/16/2017. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Pursuant to this Court's order (ECF No.18 ), the case management conference is continued to 4/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. The parties shall jointly file a case management report in accordance with the Court's order (ECF No.15 ) by no later than the close of business on Tuesday, April 18, 2017 . All other aspects of this Court's order scheduling case management conference (ECF No.15 ) remain in effect. IT IS ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minord
Minute Order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/07 9:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/7/2017. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. The parties' stipulation to continue case management conference and case management report deadline (ECF No.16 ) is GRANTED. However, the Court is not available on the dates counsel provided. Therefore, counsel shall meet and confer, determine which date works best and shall advise the deputy court clerk at (775)686-5653. The parties' stipulation to continue the deadline to submit the stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order (ECF No.17 ) is GRANTED. The parties shall file a proposed stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order by no later than the close of business on Monday, April 3, 2017 . See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation
Fri 03/03 3:53 PM
STIPULATION to Continue the Deadline to Submit the Stipulated Discovery Plan and Order by Plaintiff Mitchell Anderson, Jr.. (Throop, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation
Wed 03/01 1:19 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference and Case Management Conference Report Deadline by Plaintiff Mitchell Anderson, Jr.. (Throop, Julie) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing
Mon 02/13 5:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 2/13/2017. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 3/15/2017 at 03:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Out-of-town counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 1723 . The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Monday, March 6, 2017 . See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) |
|
Saturday, February 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Sat 02/11 10:06 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mitchell Anderson, Jr.. (Throop, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Wed 02/01 4:28 PM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Pintar, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Status Report in Removal Case
Wed 02/01 3:02 PM
STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Company. (McGaha, Pamela) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 02/01 12:02 PM
NOTICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: MINUTES OF THE COURT DATED JANUARY 17, 2017 by Geico Casualty Company re4 Minute Order re Removal,. (McGaha, Pamela) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/27 1:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Pintar, Michael) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/20 11:48 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Pintar, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Joinder
Fri 01/20 11:46 AM
JOINDER to1 Petition for Removal,, ; filed by Defendant Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Pintar, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 01/19 10:13 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Mitchell Anderson, Jr.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Throop, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 01/18 2:22 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Geico Casualty Company . (McGaha, Pamela) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Petition for Removal
Wed 01/18 2:21 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Geico Casualty Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/4/2017.(McGaha, Pamela) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Tue 01/17 8:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben, on 1/17/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/1/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice: Attorney Action Required
Tue 01/17 7:10 AM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to1 Petition for Removal. Attorney Terry A. Friedman is in violation of LR IC 2-1(g) and is advised to update his user information account in CMECF. The address on the complaint is different then his address in CMECF. Please review the docket sheet and make the necessary corrects in CMECF. (no image attached) (WJ) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 01/17 6:58 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. (WJ) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/13 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Geico Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (McGaha, Pamela) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Fri 01/13 4:30 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1441 (DIVERSITY) from Second Judicial District Corut, Case Number CV16-01988, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4436883), filed by Geico Casualty Company. Proof of service due by 2/21/2017.(McGaha, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D |