Kistler v. Kern et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Valerie P Cooke |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00024 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Duane Kern
|
|
Plaintiff
Lynne Joyce Kistler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minord
Minute Order
Wed 03/08 12:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/8/2017. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of the order approving the stipulation for dismissal (ECF No.12 ), the case management conference set before this Court on 3/15/2017 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 03/06 3:05 PM
ORDER approving ECF No.11 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 03/03 10:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Stodtmeister, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/16 4:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Stodtmeister, Ryan) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing
Mon 02/13 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 2/13/2017. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 3/15/2017 at 02:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Monday, March 6, 2017 . See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 01/26 2:57 PM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Stodtmeister, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 01/24 10:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for4 Minute Order re Removal, by Defendant Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Stodtmeister, Ryan) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/20 10:42 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lynne Joyce Kistler. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Rose, Sean) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Petition for Removal
Thu 01/19 3:57 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, to First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/5/2017.(Stodtmeister, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Tue 01/17 8:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 1/17/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/1/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order
Tue 01/17 8:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 1/17/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 01/17 7:07 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. (WJ) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 01/13 5:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Geico Insurance Agency, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Geico Casualty Company for Geico Insurance Agency, Inc. added. . (Stodtmeister, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Fri 01/13 5:20 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL Under 28 USC 1332 from Fourth Judicial District Court, Case Number CV-C-16-437, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4437054), filed by Geico Insurance Agency, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/19/2017.(Stodtmeister, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |