State of Alaska v. Zinke et al
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | Sharon L Gleason |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00013 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Nov 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 1:38 AM AKDT |
Defendant
Gregory Siekaniec
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim Kurth
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Fish And Wildlife Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of the Interior
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan Zinke
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Park Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joel Hard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitch Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Defenders of Wildlife
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Wilderness Watch
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
The Wilderness Society
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
The Humane Society of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Sierra Club
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Northern Alaska Environmental Center
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
National Wildlife Refuge Association
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
National Parks Conservation Association
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Kachemak Bay Conservation Society
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Denali Citizens Council
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Copper Country Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Center for Biological Diversity
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Alaskans for Wildlife
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Alaska Wildlife Alliance
P.O. Box 202022
Anchorage, AK 99520 |
Represented By
|
Movant
Ronald T. West
4725 Royal Avenue
Eugene, OR 97402 |
|
Plaintiff
Gilbert Huntington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joey Klutsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Safari Club International
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sportsmen's Alliance Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alaska Professional Hunters Association
Birch Horton Bittner & Cherot, P.C. 1155 Connecticut Ave. NW Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Alaska
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Dan Ashe
Terminated: 02/24/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Haugrud
Terminated: 03/22/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sally Jewell
Terminated: 02/24/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Alaska sues two federal agencies to overturn ban on hunting techniques (washingtontimes.com) |
Submitted Mon 01/16/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM AKDT |
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
256 | 256
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/10 1:56 PM
USSC NOTICE 22-401/ 21-35035 The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SXH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/03 1:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79.2(a)(2)(A), which went into effect on January 1, 2023, electronic media and other conventionally filed materials will be returned to the party to whom they belong; and pursuant to subsection (B) of that local rule, if items are not retrieved by the parties within 30 days after the Clerk has provided notice, the Clerk may destroy them. There are one or more items conventionally filed in this case re dkt 136 available at the Clerk's Office for pick up. If the item is not retrieved within 30 days of the date of this notice, the Clerk may then destroy it. (HJR, COURT STAFF) |