Robert F. Dunlap, PA
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10462 |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Debtor
Robert F. Dunlap, PA
798 Crandon Blvd Apt 36C
Key Biscayne, FL 33149-2520 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Marcia T Dunn
555 NE 15 St, Ste 934-A
Miami, FL 33132 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 01/16/2017 12:01 AM EST |