New Life Electronics Recycling, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Pamela S Hollis |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-01140 |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Debtor
New Life Electronics Recycling, Inc.
150 Kendall Point Dr. #H
Oswego, IL 60543 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Zane Zielinski, Trustee
Zane Zielinski P.C. 6336 North Cicero Suite 201
Chicago, IL 60646 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 01/16/2017 12:01 AM CST |
Sunday, January 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Sun 01/15 3:21 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $335, Filed by Bernard A Schlosser on behalf of New Life Electronics Recycling, Inc. (Schlosser, Bernard) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Pages | ||
Att: 2 Retainer Agreement signed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income (Form 122A-1/122A-1Supp)
Sun 01/15 3:27 PM
Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form (122A-1) and Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse Form 122A-1Supp The Debtor has Primarily Business Debts. Filed by Bernard A Schlosser on behalf of New Life Electronics Recycling, Inc.. (Schlosser, Bernard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement About Social Security Numbers (Form 121)
Sun 01/15 3:28 PM
Statement About Your Social Security Numbers Filed by Bernard A Schlosser on behalf of New Life Electronics Recycling, Inc.. (Schlosser, Bernard) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Sun 01/15 3:29 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Kendall County Courthouse, 807 W. John Street, First Floor, Yorkville, IL 60560. (Schlosser, Bernard) |
|
5 | 5
crditcrd
none
Sun 01/15 3:32 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-01140 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33672522. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Statement
Sun 01/15 3:44 PM
Statement Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse 122A-1Supp Filed by Bernard A Schlosser on behalf of New Life Electronics Recycling, Inc.. (Schlosser, Bernard) |