Utter, et al v. Colclazier, et al
Original Case: 6:16-cv-00182
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-07002 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 08, 2017 1:31 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
AMIE ROSE COLCLAZIER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JACK CADENHEAD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICKEY UPTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT 1-01 OF SEMINOLE COUNTY, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, a/k/a SEMINOLE SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KENA UTTER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
AUBREE HOLSAPPLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DARA CAMPBELL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2017 1:31 AM MST |
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
[10436203] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/12/2017 Docketing statement due 01/26/2017 for Dara Campbell, Aubree Holsapple and Kena Utter. Transcript order form due 01/26/2017 for Heath W. Merchen. Notice of appearance due on 01/26/2017 for Jack Cadenhead, Dara Campbell, Amie Rose Colclazier, Aubree Holsapple, Independent School District 1-01 of Seminole County, Mickey Upton and Kena Utter. 17-7002 |