1st Stop Auto Care LLC
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Marci B Mcivor |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-40504 |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Debtor
1st Stop Auto Care LLC
21231 Kaiser Rd
Gregory, MI 48137-9794 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Douglas Ellmann
308 West Huron
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 |
Docket last updated: 01/17/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/16 10:45 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-40504 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 28859950, amount . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 01/16 10:43 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy : Fee Amount $335. Filed by 1st Stop Auto Care LLC (Marrs, Michelle) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Bankruptcy Cover Sheet
Mon 01/16 10:44 AM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor 1st Stop Auto Care LLC. (Marrs, Michelle) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Mon 01/16 10:44 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor 1st Stop Auto Care LLC. (Marrs, Michelle) |
|
4 | 4
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (b)
Mon 01/16 12:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Douglas Ellmann, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/08/2017 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Hearing Room, 200 E. Liberty, Ann Arbor 341. (admin, ) |