J &J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Beck et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy S Black |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 15, 2017 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Michael A. Beck
Individually and as the alter ego 4245 Kirchling Road
Hamilton, OH 45013 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pards, Inc. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J &J Sports Productions, Inc.
1114 Fremont Avenue
South Pasadena, CA 91030 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/16 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff J &J Sports Productions, Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 06/12 3:47 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff J &J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Koberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 05/30 4:32 PM
Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 6/23/2017 at 10:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference counsel must comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found at our website at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. (sct) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/21 9:05 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Langenbahn, Jay) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/22 4:47 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Plead by Defendants Michael A. Beck, Pards, Inc. LLC. (Langenbahn, Jay) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/22 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Richard Langenbahn for Defendants Michael A. Beck, Pards, Inc. LLC (Langenbahn, Jay) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/03 1:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Pards, Inc. LLC. (Koberg, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/03 1:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Pards, Inc. LLC. Pards, Inc. LLC served on 2/28/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Koberg, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/03 1:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Michael A. Beck. Michael A. Beck served on 2/28/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Koberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/17 10:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Michael A. Beck, Pards, Inc. LLC. (eh) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 01/17 10:45 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) |
||
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/16 4:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff J &J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Koberg, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/16 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael A. Beck, Pards, Inc., LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5800430), filed by J &J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Koberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form Michael A. Beck, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form Pards, Inc. LLC - Kirchling Rd, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form Pards Inc. LLC - Blue Rock St. |