PSGI Airport, Inc.
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jean K Fitzsimon |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10311 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
PSGI Airport, Inc.
1873 Marlton Pike E Ste 2-D
Cherry Hill, NJ 08003-2012 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 6:07 PM EDT |
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 02/27 2:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (C., Denine) |
||
Saturday, February 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 02/12 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 02/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents
Thu 02/09 12:38 PM
Order Dismissing PSGI, Airport, Inc.for failure to file missing documents (C., Denine) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 02/03 1:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by CHRISTOPHER R. MOMJIAN Filed by CHRISTOPHER R. MOMJIAN on behalf of Commonwealth of PA, Dept of Revenue. (MOMJIAN, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13
credact
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 02/03 9:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by MEGAN N. HARPER Filed by MEGAN N. HARPER on behalf of City of Philadelphia. (HARPER, MEGAN) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 01/21 1:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Number of Notices Mailed: . No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 01/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition
Sat 01/21 1:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition. Number of Notices Mailed: . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
credact
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 01/19 9:43 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PA UCTS. (CSU - OUCTS, PA Department of Labor and Industry) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (multi)
Wed 01/18 10:37 AM
Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/23/2017 at 02:00 PM at 833 Chestnut Street, Suite 501, Philadelphia. (H., Lisa) |
|
8 | 8
order
Requiring Documents
Wed 01/18 10:09 AM
Order Entered the debtor having failed to file or submit with the petition all of the documents required by Fed. R. Bankr.P.1007, It is hereby ORDERED that this case MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE if the documents listed are not filed by deadlines listed: Atty Disclosure Statement due 01/31/2017. Schedule A/B due 01/31/2017. Schedule D due 01/31/2017. Schedule E/F due 01/31/2017. Schedule G due 01/31/2017. Schedule H due 01/31/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/31/2017. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Form B206 due 1/31/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 1/31/2017. Small Business Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, Federal Income Tax Return or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due by 1/31/2017. Any request for an extension of time must be filed prior to the expiration of the deadlines listed. (S., Antoinette) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Wed 01/18 9:59 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by CHRISTIAN A. DICICCO on behalf of PSGI Airport, Inc. . (S., Antoinette) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wed 01/18 9:59 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by CHRISTIAN A. DICICCO on behalf of PSGI Airport, Inc. . (S., Antoinette) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 01/17 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by CHRISTINE LEIGH BARBA Filed by CHRISTINE LEIGH BARBA on behalf of MarketPlace PHL LLC. (BARBA, CHRISTINE) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 01/17 9:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by GEORGE M. CONWAY Filed by GEORGE M. CONWAY on behalf of United States Trustee. (CONWAY, GEORGE) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Resolution
Tue 01/17 1:11 AM
Corporate Resolution Filed by CHRISTIAN A. DICICCO on behalf of PSGI Airport, Inc.. (DICICCO, CHRISTIAN) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Matrix
Tue 01/17 12:57 AM
Matrix Filed. Number of pages filed: 1, Filed by CHRISTIAN A. DICICCO on behalf of PSGI Airport, Inc.. (DICICCO, CHRISTIAN) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 01/17 12:57 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by PSGI Airport, Inc.. Corporate Resolution due 01/31/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due 01/31/2017. Schedule A/B due 01/31/2017. Schedule D due 01/31/2017. Schedule E/F due 01/31/2017. Schedule G due 01/31/2017. Schedule H due 01/31/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/31/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities Form B106 due 01/31/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/31/2017. Chapter 11 Sm Business Plan due by 11/13/2017. (DICICCO, CHRISTIAN) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 01/17 12:59 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10311 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18287926. Fee Amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |