LJ Trans, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert N Kwan |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10483 |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Debtor
LJ Trans, Inc.
171 Junipero Serra Dr Apt B
San Gabriel, CA 91776-1241 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Brad D Krasnoff (TR)
1900 Avenue of the Stars, 11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/17/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 01/16 3:09 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10483) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44047251. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Mon 01/16 3:17 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/24/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Tam, Maria) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 01/16 3:06 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by LJ Trans, Inc. (Tam, Maria) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Mon 01/16 3:06 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor LJ Trans, Inc.. (Tam, Maria) |