Johnson v. Orchide LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Howard R Lloyd |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00208 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 15, 2017 2:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Orchide LLC
|
|
Defendant
Starbucks Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/09 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy L. Arias (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 4/9/2018) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 10/02 6:24 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER without prejudice filed by Scott Johnson.(Grace, Phyl) (Filed on 10/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/22 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Irene Melton(Melton, Mary) (Filed on 9/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 11:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byOrchide LLC. (Palazzolo, Laura) (Filed on 9/11/2017) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/18 7:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Orchide LLC served on 8/17/2017, answer due 9/7/2017. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 8/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Tue 07/25 2:47 PM
ORDER RESETTING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/25/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017) |
|
16 | 16
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 07/25 2:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd: Status Conference held on 7/25/2017. Plaintiff to have an additional 30 days to serve remaining defendant. Additional deadlines are extended are extended accordingly. FTR Time 1:57-2:04. Plaintiff Attorney Mary Melton. Defendant Attorney Ashley Arnett via telephone. This is a text-only Minute Entry (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2017) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Mon 07/24 4:56 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 14 defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel to arrange for 7/25/2017 appearance via CourtCall. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appear by Telephone
Mon 07/24 10:58 AM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone with Proposed Order filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Arnett, Ashley) (Filed on 7/24/2017) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/03 11:34 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 7/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/3/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2017) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/01 11:22 AM
NOTICE by Scott Johnson of Withdrawal of Counsel for Teresa Allen(Potter, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/15 10:25 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Singh, Shane) (Filed on 3/15/2017) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/03 9:35 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson..(Handy, Russell) (Filed on 3/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 proof of service | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 03/02 9:21 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 3/16/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/21 2:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byStarbucks Corporation. (Singh, Shane) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/10 12:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Starbucks Corporation served on 1/30/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/26 4:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Orchide LLC, Starbucks Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Thu 01/26 4:25 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/26 8:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/9/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 01/16 3:33 AM
Proposed Summons. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 1/16/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 01/16 3:31 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re1 Complaint, (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 1/16/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/16 3:27 AM
COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11076289.). Filed byScott Johnson.(Handy, Russell) (Filed on 1/16/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |