Wofford v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00138 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 15, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
PHH Mortgage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Wofford
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 06/22/2017
1550 Peachtree Street, N.W.
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Silver State Schools Credit Union
Terminated: 03/09/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 07/07/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/26 7:26 AM
ORDER Granting33 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to PHH Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/20 8:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of PHH Mortgage Corporation also known as Mortgage Service Center, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Gina Wofford. (Clark, Miles) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/07 3:10 PM
ORDER Granting31 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Trans Union LLC with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/05 2:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Trans Union LLC, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Gina Wofford. (Clark, Miles) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/23 4:10 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 06/22 11:18 AM
ORDER Granting28 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 06/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/21 5:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Equifax Information Services, LLC, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Gina Wofford. (Clark, Miles) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 06/05 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiff and Trans Union, LLC by Gina Wofford. (Clark, Miles) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 04/24 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiff and PHH by Gina Wofford. (Clark, Miles) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Thu 04/06 2:02 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ADR) |
|
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/06 2:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re23 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/7/2017. Motions due by 9/6/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Wed 04/05 3:11 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Gina Wofford . (Clark, Miles) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 04/04 10:12 AM
ORDER Granting21 Motion to Extend Time. PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 4/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/03 2:23 PM
Joint MOTION Extend PHH Mortgage Corporation's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re1 Complaint,, by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 4/17/2017. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 03/16 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiff and Equifax Information Services, LLC by Gina Wofford. (Clark, Miles) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Mon 03/13 3:54 PM
ORDER Granting18 Motion to Extend Time. PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 4/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Fri 03/10 1:55 PM
JOINT SECOND MOTION to Extend Time re1 Complaint, filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 3/24/2017. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/09 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Gina Wofford. of Defendant Silver State Schools Credit Union (Clark, Miles) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 03/10 8:36 AM
Party Silver State Schools Credit Union terminated per17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ADR) |
||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 02/28 4:09 PM
ORDER Granting15 Stipulation to Extend Time. Silver State Schools Credit Union answer due 3/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/27 2:09 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re1 Complaint,, ; by Defendant Silver State Schools Credit Union. (Hernandez, Ramir) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 02/14 1:03 PM
ORDER Granting10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request). Defendant Silver State Schools Credit Union's response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint due 2/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 02/14 1:00 PM
ORDER Granting6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request). Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint due 3/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1
Mon 02/13 4:33 PM
FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 5-1 re9 Notice of Appearance,10 Stipulation for Extension, and11 Certificate of Interested Parties (signed by Ramir Hernandez) that Michael Brooks and Ramir Hernandez are in violation of Local Rule LR IC 5-1 The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. Attorney advised in the future to file document in accordance with Local Rules governing Electronic Case Filing. (EDS) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 02/13 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Silver State Schools Credit Union. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Brooks, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/13 2:42 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, ; by Defendant Silver State Schools Credit Union. (Brooks, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/13 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir M. Hernandez Michael R Brooks on behalf of Defendant Silver State Schools Credit Union. (Brooks, Michael) Modified text on 2/13/2017 (EDS) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 02/13 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners, Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC added. . |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/13 1:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/30/2017 |
|
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/13 11:16 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, ; by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Austin, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 02/08 10:22 AM
ORDER Granting4 Stipulation to Extend Time. PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 3/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/06 10:47 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/17 11:31 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants re1 Complaint. (ADR) |
|
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 01/16 9:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Gina Wofford. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Clark, Miles) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/16 9:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4437237), filed by Gina Wofford. Proof of service due by 4/16/2017.(Clark, Miles) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Equifax, | ||
Att: 2 Summons PHH Mortgage Corporation, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Silver State Schools Credit Union, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Trans Union | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 01/17 10:53 AM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR) |