Chico Health Imaging, LLC
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher D Jaime |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-20247 |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jul 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Chico Health Imaging, LLC
720 Mangrove Ave Ste 230
Chico, CA 95926-3948 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
349 | 349
utility
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
Thu 12/21 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
348 | 348
utility
Final Decree (Certificate)
Thu 12/21 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Final Decree as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
347 | 347
misc
Matter Held *
Wed 12/20 8:28 AM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved Without Oral Argument Re:339 Motion/Application for Final Decree [GTG-18] CONCLUDED (dhes) |
|
346 | 346
notice
BNC Service of Document
Tue 12/19 3:47 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (ltas) |
|
345 | 345
notice
Final Decree and Close BK - 7, 11, 12, 13 (BNC)
Tue 12/19 3:46 PM
Bankruptcy case closed. Final Decree as transmitted to BNC for Service. (ltas) |
|
344 | 344
order
Generic Order
Tue 12/19 3:43 PM
Order Granting339 Motion/Application for Final Decree [GTG-18] (ltas) |