Svitlana Romanova and Metinvest B.V.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10130 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2017 |
Debtor
Metinvest B.V.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Foreign Representative
Svitlana Romanova
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 05/11 2:55 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Final Decree
Tue 05/09 9:47 AM
Order Granting Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Case. Order Signed on 5/8/2017. (LCN) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Tue 05/09 8:52 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Svitlana Romanova. Hearing scheduled for 5/10/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Fri 05/05 2:37 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Svitlana Romanova. Hearing scheduled for 5/10/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
Fri 05/05 2:34 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion for Final Decree - (I) Final Report and (II) Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Case Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Thu 05/04 4:08 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding (I) Final Report and (II) Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Case Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Wed 04/12 2:25 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Motion for Final Decree - (I) Final Report and (II) Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Case Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 04/11 2:00 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Motion for Final Decree - (I) Final Report and (II) Motino to Close the Chapter 15 Case Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Affidavit
Wed 04/05 8:49 AM
Affidavit - Certification Regarding Filing and Service of Foreign Representative's (I) Final Report and (II) Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Case Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Final Decree - Motion
Tue 04/04 10:45 AM
Motion for Final Decree - (I) Final Report and (II) Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Case Filed by Svitlana Romanova. Hearing scheduled for 5/10/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/4/2017. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
Omnibus Hearing Dates
Wed 03/29 9:55 AM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware . Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 5/10/2017 at 11:30 AM. Signed on 3/29/2017. (CMB) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Tue 03/28 3:50 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Wed 02/08 12:58 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Svitlana Romanova. Hearing scheduled for 2/8/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order
Wed 02/08 11:29 AM
Order Granting Recognition and Related Relief Order Signed on 2/8/2017. (CMB) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Mon 02/06 9:58 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Svitlana Romanova. Hearing scheduled for 2/8/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
Thu 02/02 4:04 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Related Relief Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 01/24 2:06 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Service - Notice
Fri 01/20 11:44 AM
Notice of Service Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Hearing - Notice
Fri 01/20 8:58 AM
Notice of Hearing - Notice of Filing and of Hearing on Verified Petition Seeking Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Related Relief Pursuant to Chapter 15 of the United States Bankruptcy Code Filed by Svitlana Romanova. Hearing scheduled for 2/8/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/1/2017. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order
Fri 01/20 8:29 AM
Order (I) Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice, (II) Scheduling Hearings, (III) Waiving the Litigation Party Disclosure Requirements of Bankruptcy Rule 1007(a)(4), and (IV) Waiving the Claim Process Notice Requirements of Section 1514(c) Order Signed on 1/20/2017. (CMB) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 01/19 11:57 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Mark Nixdorf Order Signed on 1/19/2017. (CMB) |
|
11 | 11
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 01/19 11:56 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Daniel Guyder Order Signed on 1/19/2017. (CMB) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 01/18 12:55 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Mark Nixdorf of Allen & Overy LLP . Receipt Number 2067179, Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 01/18 12:54 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Daniel Guyder of Allen & Overy LLP . Receipt Number 2067179, Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
crditcrd
none
Tue 01/17 3:15 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 17-10130 [misc,volpfp15] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8307705, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
Tue 01/17 3:14 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Order (I) Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice, (II) Scheduling Hearings, (III) Waiving the Litigation Party Disclosure Requirements of Bankruptcy Rule 1007(a)(4), and (IV) Waiving the Claim Process Notice Requirements of Section 1514(c) Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Approve - Motion
Tue 01/17 2:50 PM
Motion to Approve - Motion for Order (I) Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice, (II) Scheduling Hearings, (III) Waiving the Litigation Party Disclosure Requirements of Bankruptcy Rule 1007(a)(4), and (IV) Waiving the Claim Process Notice Requirements of Section 1514(c) Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Memorandum of Law
Tue 01/17 2:48 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Related Relief Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Tue 01/17 2:44 PM
Declaration of Daniel J. Guyder in Support of Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Related Relief Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Tue 01/17 2:39 PM
Declaration - Statement of Svitlana Romanova in Support of Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Related Relief Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit
Tue 01/17 2:35 PM
Exhibit(s) - Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Related Relief Filed by Svitlana Romanova. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
misc
RETIRED - Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)
Tue 01/17 2:27 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Svitlana Romanova, Metinvest B.V.. (Barry, Joseph) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 01/17 2:38 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case.(AK) |