Hot & the Gang, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10503 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Debtor
Hot & the Gang, Inc.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Sam S Leslie (TR)
3435 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 990
Los Angeles, CA 90010 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/17/2017 12:03 PM PST |
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 01/17 10:37 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10503) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44050188. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Tue 01/17 10:55 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/28/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Nachimson, Benjamin) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 01/17 10:36 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Hot & the Gang, Inc. (Nachimson, Benjamin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Tue 01/17 10:40 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Hot & the Gang, Inc.. (Nachimson, Benjamin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Tue 01/17 10:42 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Hot & the Gang, Inc.. (Nachimson, Benjamin) |