Familia Flores Incorporated
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | René Lastreto II |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10131 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Familia Flores Incorporated
838 W Main St
Merced, CA 95340-4616 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Closing Dismissed/Reopened Case (Produces Form)
Wed 03/22 10:09 AM
Order Closing Case where Case has been Dismissed (kvas) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Matter Dropped *
Thu 03/16 9:32 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Dropped Re:1 Voluntary Petition (jdaf) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
utility
Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Timely File Documents (Certificate)
Fri 03/03 9:30 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Timely File Documents as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Timely File Documents (on NOI) BNC
Wed 03/01 11:33 AM
Bankruptcy Case dismissed. Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Timely File Documents as transmitted to BNC for Service. (mpem) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
trustee
341 Mtg Continued - Including Amended
Tue 02/21 10:45 AM
Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. The 341 Meeting was adjourned on 02/21/17. Debtor Appeared; Counsel of Record Appeared; Robin Tubesing, Attorney for the U.S. Trustees Office, appeared. Continued Meeting of Creditors to be held on 3/21/2017 at 01:00 PM at Fresno Meeting Room 1452. (Tubesing, Robin) |
||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
utility
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
Thu 02/16 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
BNC Service of Document
Tue 02/14 10:15 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (jdas) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules (Order)
Tue 02/14 10:14 AM
Order Granting23 Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information; Documents due: February 28, 2017 [HLF-3] Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Schedule A/B - Real and Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors;Schedule E/F - Unsecured Claims; Schedule G - Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases; Schedule H - Codebtors; Statement of Financial Affairs; List of Equity Security Holders; Attorney Disclosure Statement; (jdas) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Order for Judge's Signature - Motion Extend Schedules/Documents/Plan Deadlines
Thu 02/09 5:57 PM
Docket Entry Reserved for Internal Use/Order Processing23 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. [HLF-3] The case trustee and the U.S. Trustee have been given electronic notice of the Ex Parte Motion as required by FRBP 1007(c). (kvas) |
|
24 | 24
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Thu 02/09 5:56 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of23 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. [HLF-3] The case trustee and the U.S. Trustee have been given electronic notice of the Ex Parte Motion as required by FRBP 1007(c). (kvas) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Including Amended Motion
Thu 02/09 5:55 PM
Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. [HLF-3] The case trustee and the U.S. Trustee have been given electronic notice of the Ex Parte Motion as required by FRBP 1007(c). Filed by Debtor Familia Flores Incorporated (kvas) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Document - Including Amended
Tue 02/07 1:30 PM
Corporate Resolution Authorizing Bankruptcy Filing Filed by Debtor Familia Flores Incorporated (kvas) |
|
21 | 21
order
Employ (Order)
Tue 02/07 10:51 AM
Order Granting14 Motion/Application to Employ Justin D. Harris [HLF-2] (kvas) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
utility
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
Wed 02/01 9:26 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
notice
BNC Service of Document
Mon 01/30 10:45 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (kvas) |
|
Saturday, January 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Mon 01/30 10:47 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,14 Motion/Application to Employ Justin D. Harris as Attorney(s) [HLF-2],15 Declaration (kvas) |
|
17 | 17
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules (Order)
Mon 01/30 10:44 AM
Order Granting11 Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information; Documents due: 2/14/17 Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Schedule A/B - Real and Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors;Schedule E/F - Unsecured Claims; Schedule G - Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases; Schedule H - Codebtors; Statement of Financial Affairs; List of Equity Security Holders; Attorney Disclosure Statement (kvas) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
related
Declaration
Fri 01/27 2:16 PM
Declaration of Justin D. Harris in support of14 Motion/Application to Employ Justin D. Harris as Attorney(s) [HLF-2] (kvas) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Employ - Including Amended Motion
Fri 01/27 2:14 PM
Motion/Application to Employ Justin D. Harris as Attorney(s) [HLF-2] Filed by Debtor Familia Flores Incorporated (kvas) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Thu 01/26 1:48 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. [HLF-1] The case trustee and the U.S. Trustee have been given electronic notice of the Ex Parte Motion as required by FRBP 1007(c). (kvas) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Including Amended Motion
Thu 01/26 1:42 PM
Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. [HLF-1] The case trustee and the U.S. Trustee have been given electronic notice of the Ex Parte Motion as required by FRBP 1007(c). Filed by Debtor Familia Flores Incorporated (kvas) |
|
misc
Order for Judge's Signature - Motion Extend Schedules/Documents/Plan Deadlines
Thu 01/26 1:44 PM
Docket Entry Reserved for Internal Use/Order Processing11 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. [HLF-1] The case trustee and the U.S. Trustee have been given electronic notice of the Ex Parte Motion as required by FRBP 1007(c). (kvas) |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Early Scheduling/Case Management Hearing - Chapter 11 (Certificate)
Fri 01/27 9:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Early Scheduling/Case Management Hearing as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference (BNC) - Including Amended Notice
Wed 01/25 6:46 AM
Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re:1 Voluntary Petition to be held on 3/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 13, Department B (kvas) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 01/20 1:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (kvas) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case (Certificate)
Sat 01/21 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
utility
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Certificate)
Sat 01/21 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
notice
BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case
Thu 01/19 12:11 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (kvas) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Chapter 11 First Meeting Notice
Thu 01/19 10:31 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 2/21/2017 at 10:00 AM at Fresno Meeting Room 1452. Last day to oppose dischargeability of certain debts: 4/24/2017. Proofs of Claim due by 5/22/2017. (Gaytan, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request for Special Notice
Tue 01/17 3:58 PM
Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Business Loan Center, LLC (dchf) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Master Address List
Tue 01/17 11:23 AM
Master Address List (auto) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case
Tue 01/17 11:23 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. (bres) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition 11 - Case Upload
Tue 01/17 11:22 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Missing Document(s): Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Schedule A/B - Real and Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors; Schedule E/F - Unsecured Claims; Schedule G - Executory Contracts; Schedule H - Codebtors; Statement of Financial Affairs; List - Equity Security Holders; Attorney's Disclosure Stmt.; Document(s) due by 01/31/2017. (Fee Paid $1717.00) (eFilingID: 5962551) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate DEBTOR - Including Supplemental
Tue 01/17 11:26 AM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (bres)(See Page #9 of Voluntary Petition) |
|
utility
Add Party
Tue 01/17 11:22 AM
|
||
misc
EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (11)
Tue 01/17 11:23 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,717.00, Receipt Number: 325811, eFilingID: 5962551) (auto) |