Spottiswood v. United States
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maria-Elena James |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00209 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Spottiswood
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 24 2018
ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 05/22 12:03 PM
ORDER of USCA as to31 Notice of Appeal filed by John Spottiswood (hdjS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 06/19 4:24 PM
USCA Case Number 18-16103 9th Circuit for31 Notice of Appeal filed by John Spottiswood. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 06/13 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by John Spottiswood. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12432768 paid.) (Greenberg, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Tue 04/24 2:41 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/24/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018) |
|
29 | 29
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 04/24 2:32 PM
ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 04/19 1:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2018. FTR Time: 10:08-10:20. Plaintiff Attorney: Douglas Greenberg, Esq. Defendant Attorney: Cynthia Stier, AUSA. Attachment: Minutes of Motion hearing; argument heard, matter submitted. Matter taken under submission. Court to issue Order. See attached minutes. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2018) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Response ( Non Motion )
Wed 04/18 6:26 PM
RESPONSE to Court's Order by John Spottiswood. (Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 4/18/2018) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Response ( Non Motion )
Wed 04/18 2:32 PM
RESPONSE to re25 Order Response To Order: Hearing On Cross Motions For Summary Judgment by United States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 4/18/2018) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/16 9:53 AM
ORDER re: Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/16/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 03/16 1:31 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 23 Stipulation Motion hearing. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 03/16 11:21 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE HEARING filed by John Spottiswood. (Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 3/16/2018) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 02/05 5:13 PM
ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 21 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 02/05 3:42 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To Reschedule Hearing On Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment To March 15, 2018 And [Proposed] Order filed by United States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 2/5/2018) |
|
20 | 20
5
pgs
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 02/05 2:49 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment filed byUnited States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 2/5/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
oth_sup
Brief
Wed 01/31 12:57 PM
Brief re18 First MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byJohn Spottiswood. (Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 1/31/2018) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 01/31 12:55 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Spottiswood. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018.(Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 1/31/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit IRS Efiling transcripts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit IRS paper return procedures, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit IRS efiling procedures | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
oth_sup
Brief
Mon 01/22 5:09 PM
Brief re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment filed byUnited States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/22/2018) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 01/22 5:01 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018.(Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/22/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/12 4:14 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by United States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 1/12/2018) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Status Report Order
Mon 01/08 1:01 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/8/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 10/26 4:11 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Discovery and Status Report. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2017. Dispositive Motion due by 12/28/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Opposition due by 1/11/2018. Reply due by 1/18/2018. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 10/25 2:31 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Extend Discovery and Status Report [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by United States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 10/25/2017) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 07/07 10:46 AM
ORDER re 10 Case Management Statement filed by United States; Vacating Case Management Conference and setting deadlines: Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/17/2017. Status Report due by 8/10/2017.Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 07/05 1:53 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/5/2017) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 4:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/12/2017) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/06 1:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Spottiswood.. (Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/06 12:09 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States.. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 04/11 4:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed by 7/6/2017. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 01/19 3:44 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 01/18 11:58 AM
Summons Issued as to United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/17 12:13 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 01/17 10:46 AM
Proposed Summons. (Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT by JOHN SPOTTISWOOD et al. against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against JOHN SPOTTISWOOD ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11077226.). Filed byJOHN SPOTTISWOOD.(Greenberg, Douglas) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |