Figueroa Zarceno v. City and County of San Francisco et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00229 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Eric Balmy
|
|
Defendant
Nicole Chambers
|
|
Defendant
Toney Chaplin
|
|
Defendant
City and County of San Francisco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin Clifford
|
|
Defendant
Vicki Hennessey
|
|
Defendant
Trevor Kelly
|
|
Defendant
Dayna Thibeaux
|
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Figueroa Zarceno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order Terminate Civil Case
Wed 09/06 6:27 PM
ORDER re 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Vicki Hennessey, Dayna Thibeaux, Toney Chaplin, Trevor Kelly, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/01 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Toney Chaplin, City and County of San Francisco, Vicki Hennessey, Trevor Kelly, Dayna Thibeaux (Oldfather, Newton) (Filed on 9/1/2017) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 08/22 4:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 33 Stipulation. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 08/21 7:06 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Dismissal filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/21/2017) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Statement
Fri 08/04 12:40 PM
Joint Statement Regarding Order to File Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/4/2017) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Fri 07/28 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Belinda S Lee (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/28/2017) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/05 8:54 AM
ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 29 Joint Statement Regarding Order To File Stipulation Of Dismissal filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. Dismissal or Statement due by 8/4/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Statement
Fri 06/02 2:07 PM
Statement Joint Statement Regarding Order To File Stipulation Of Dismissal by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/2/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/18 4:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 8 Summons and 1 Complaint upon Sergeant Trevor Kelly (in his official capacity) (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2017) |
|
27 | 27
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/18 4:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 8 Summons and 1 Complaint upon Sergeant Eric Balmy (in his official capacity) (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2017) |
|
26 | 26
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/18 4:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 8 Summons and 1 Complaint upon Public Service Agent Nicole Chambers (in her official capacity) (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2017) |
|
25 | 25
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/18 4:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 8 Summons and 1 Complaint upon Officer Kevin Clifford (in his official capacity) (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2017) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/18 4:37 PM
ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Notice of Pending Settlement and Request for Continuance of the Case Management Conference filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. Dismissal or Statement due by 6/2/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 04/17 7:34 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Notice of Pending Settlement and Request for Continuance of the Case Management Conference filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno.(Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Nicholas Y. Lin | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 04/05 5:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
Wed 04/05 4:37 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/5/2017) |
|
20 | 20
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Wed 04/05 4:36 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/5/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 03/21 1:01 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT TO MARCH 31, 2017 filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Oldfather, Newton) (Filed on 3/21/2017) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 02/10 5:49 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to March 7, 2017 filed by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno. (Lin, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 01/26 8:43 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District | ||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 01/25 4:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 8 Summons and 1 Complaint upon Central Warrant Bureau Agent Dayna Thibeaux (in her official capacity) (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
15 | 15
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 01/25 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 7 Summons and 1 Complaint upon Sheriff Vicki Hennessy (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
14 | 14
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 01/25 4:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 7 Summons and 1 Complaint upon Acting Chief of Police Toney Chaplin (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
13 | 13
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 01/25 4:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno of 7 Summons and 1 Complaint upon the City and County of San Francisco (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/25 3:24 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/25/17.(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 01/24 7:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno re9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Amended) (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 01/24 5:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/24 3:17 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno..(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 4:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Eric Balmy, Nicole Chambers, Kevin Clifford, Trevor Kelly. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Toney Chaplin, City and County of San Francisco, Vicki Hennessey. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/19 12:43 PM
Proposed Summons. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/18 4:28 PM
Proposed Summons. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 01/18 11:43 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 01/18 2:56 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 01/17 4:43 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11079785.). Filed byPedro Figueroa Zarceno.(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |