Pennie v. Twitter, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00230 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 1:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Google, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Twitter, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Demetrick Pennie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Zamarripa
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 04 2017
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017) |
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
62 | 62
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 10/31 7:00 PM
ORDER of USCA as to60 Notice of Appeal filed by Demetrick Pennie, Rick Zamarripa. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) |