Fasching et al v. FCA US LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00231 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Bosch LLC
|
|
Defendant
Robert Bosch GmBH
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph L. Weber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey W. Griggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Elowitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josh Clafin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl Calhoun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Binh Quoc Tran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Satyanam Singh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Radziewicz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Neupert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Muckenfuss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas McGann, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mathue Fasching
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, September 24, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/24 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal -- PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a) by Karl Calhoun, Josh Clafin, Mathue Fasching, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Michael Johnson, Thomas McGann, Jr., Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph Neupert, John Radziewicz, Binh Quoc Tran, Jeffrey Weaver, Joseph L. Weber (Cabraser, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 05/04 3:46 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 05/01 10:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE confirming that the initial case management conference for this MDL case and all member cases is set for 5/24/17 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Edward M. Chen. All other case management conferences previously set have been vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/13 3:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Johnson, Binh Quoc Tran, Thomas McGann, Jr., Mathue Fasching, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Josh Clafin, John Radziewicz, Joseph Neupert, Karl Calhoun, Jeffrey Weaver, Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph L. Weber, Steven Elowitz, Satyanam Singh. Summons Returned Executed on Robert Bosch LLC as agent for Robert Bosch GmbH (DE)) (Cappio, Gretchen) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
40 | 40
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/13 3:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Johnson, Binh Quoc Tran, Thomas McGann, Jr., Mathue Fasching, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Josh Clafin, John Radziewicz, Joseph Neupert, Karl Calhoun, Jeffrey Weaver, Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph L. Weber, Steven Elowitz, Satyanam Singh. Robert Bosch GmBH served on 4/4/2017, answer due 4/25/2017. Summons Returned Executed on Robert Bosch LLC as agent for Robert Bosch GmbH (Cal) (Cappio, Gretchen) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 3:20 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 2:30 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11238640.) filed by Karl Calhoun, Josh Clafin, Steven Elowitz, Mathue Fasching, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Michael Johnson, Thomas McGann, Jr., Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph Neupert, John Radziewicz, Satyanam Singh, Binh Quoc Tran, Jeffrey Weaver, Joseph L. Weber.(Bailey, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/16/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/10 1:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Johnson, Binh Quoc Tran, Thomas McGann, Jr., Mathue Fasching, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Josh Clafin, John Radziewicz, Joseph Neupert, Karl Calhoun, Jeffrey Weaver, Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph L. Weber, Steven Elowitz, Satyanam Singh. Robert Bosch LLC served on 2/22/2017, answer due 3/15/2017. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
36 | 36
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/10 1:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Johnson, Binh Quoc Tran, Thomas McGann, Jr., Mathue Fasching, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Josh Clafin, John Radziewicz, Joseph Neupert, Karl Calhoun, Jeffrey Weaver, Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph L. Weber, Steven Elowitz, Satyanam Singh. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. served on 2/1/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
35 | 35
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/10 12:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Johnson, Binh Quoc Tran, Thomas McGann, Jr., Mathue Fasching, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Josh Clafin, John Radziewicz, Joseph Neupert, Karl Calhoun, Jeffrey Weaver, Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph L. Weber, Steven Elowitz, Satyanam Singh. FCA US LLC served on 1/25/2017, answer due 2/15/2017. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 02/15 3:39 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 3/2/2017 to 6/1/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
33 | 33
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 02/15 3:13 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Action Pending Decision By The JPML filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/15 2:58 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (McDevitt). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/15 2:56 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Cappio). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/15 2:55 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Loeser). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/15 2:53 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Sarko). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/15 2:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Cafasso, Darrell). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/15 2:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Giuffra). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/15 2:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Monahan). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
utility
Case Stayed
Wed 02/15 3:47 PM
Case Stayed. CMC set for 6/1/17 at 9:30 a.m. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/14 10:57 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ryan P. McDevitt ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11155423.) filed by Karl Calhoun, Josh Clafin, Steven Elowitz, Mathue Fasching, Michael Johnson, Thomas McGann, Jr., Joseph Neupert, Jeffrey Weaver, Joseph L. Weber. (McDevitt, Ryan) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/14 10:54 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gretchen Freeman Cappio ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11155404.) filed by Karl Calhoun, Josh Clafin, Steven Elowitz, Mathue Fasching, Michael Johnson, Thomas McGann, Jr., Joseph Neupert, Jeffrey Weaver, Joseph L. Weber. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/14 10:52 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Derek W. Loeser ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11155385.) filed by Karl Calhoun, Josh Clafin, Steven Elowitz, Mathue Fasching, Michael Johnson, Thomas McGann, Jr., Joseph Neupert, Jeffrey Weaver, Joseph L. Weber. (Loeser, Derek) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/14 10:49 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Lynn Lincoln Sarko ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11155312.) filed by Karl Calhoun, Josh Clafin, Steven Elowitz, Mathue Fasching, Michael Johnson, Thomas McGann, Jr., Joseph Neupert, Jeffrey Weaver, Joseph L. Weber. (Sarko, Lynn) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/13 11:15 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11151745.) filed by FCA US LLC.(Cafasso, Darrell) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
20 | 20
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/13 11:09 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11151683.) filed by FCA US LLC.(Giuffra, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/13 10:53 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11151523.) filed by FCA US LLC.(Monahan, William) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 02/10 4:03 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Action Pending Decision By The JPML filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Monahan, William) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/09 1:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Robert Bosch GmBH, Robert Bosch LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 02/08 7:34 PM
Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 02/08 7:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Robert Bosch GmBH, Robert Bosch LLC. Filed byJohn Radziewicz, Joseph Neupert, Binh Quoc Tran, Thomas McGann, Jr., Mathue Fasching, Bryan Muckenfuss, Satyanam Singh, Steven Elowitz, Jeffrey W. Griggs, Michael Johnson, Jeffrey Weaver, Karl Calhoun, Josh Clafin, Joseph L. Weber. (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 02/01 10:52 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/31 4:02 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Relating Case
Fri 01/27 12:45 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/24 2:44 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 10 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/24 6:43 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joey P. Leniski, Jr ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11096531.) filed by Mathue Fasching, Thomas McGann, Jr., Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph Neupert, John Radziewicz, Satyanam Singh, Binh Quoc Tran.(Leniski, Joe) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/18 5:43 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. J. Gerard Stranch, IV representing all named plaintiffs. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/18 4:43 PM
NOTICE by Mathue Fasching, Thomas McGann, Jr., Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph Neupert, John Radziewicz, Satyanam Singh, Binh Quoc Tran Notice of Related Cases (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/18 11:41 AM
Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 01/18 11:39 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 01/18/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/18 8:44 AM
MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice J. Gerard Stranch, IV ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11081130.) filed by Mathue Fasching, Thomas McGann, Jr., Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph Neupert, John Radziewicz, Satyanam Singh, Binh Quoc Tran.(Stranch, James) (Filed on 1/18/2017) Modified on 1/18/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 01/18 8:17 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 01/17 6:57 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Mathue Fasching, Thomas McGann, Jr., Bryan Muckenfuss, Joseph Neupert, John Radziewicz, Satyanam Singh, Binh Quoc Tran re1 Complaint, (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 01/17 6:54 PM
Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 6:52 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11080633.). Filed byJohn Radziewicz, Joseph Neupert, Binh Quoc Tran, Thomas McGann, Jr., Mathue Fasching, Bryan Muckenfuss, Satyanam Singh.(Lewis, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |