13
|
|
13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 05/08 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Ngoc Lam Che (Tsao, Pamela) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/29 10:17 AM
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/29/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/28 12:30 PM
NOTICE by Ngoc Lam Che (Tsao, Pamela) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 03/28 10:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Case Management Conference for 5/31/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 03/28 10:44 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/11/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 02/15 1:42 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by John T. Vidovich. (Fashing, Peter) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 02/06 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Pamela Tsao (Tsao, Pamela) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/18 2:16 PM
Summons Issued as to John T. Vidovich. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Wed 01/18 1:51 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 01/18 10:41 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 01/17 9:40 AM
Proposed Summons. (Tsao, Pamela) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 01/17 9:38 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ngoc Lam Che (Tsao, Pamela) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 9:37 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHN T. VIDOCICH ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11077215.). Filed byNgoc Lam Che.(Tsao, Pamela) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|