Aspic Engineering and Construction Company v. ECC Centcom Constructors LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00224 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
ECC Centcom Constructors LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ECC International LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aspic Engineering and Construction Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
66 | 66
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/23 11:55 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE re 65 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by Aspic Engineering and Construction Company, ECC Centcom Constructors LLC, ECC International LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/23/19. (fs, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
65 | 65
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Fri 09/20 11:35 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Statement Regarding Case Status filed by Aspic Engineering and Construction Company.(Pennington, Walt) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration Concerning Concurrence of Non-Filing Signatories |