Horst v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Walter H Rice |
Referred: | Michael J Newman |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00013 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Interested Party
SSA
|
|
Plaintiff
Brian L. Horst
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 03/02 8:30 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/2/2018. (srb) |
|
12 | 12
7
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 03/02 8:28 AM
DECISION AND ENTRY REJECTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. #10 ); OBJECTIONS OF PLAINTIFF, DARLENE GENTRY, TO SAID JUDICIAL FILING (DOC. #11 ) ARE SUSTAINED; JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT NANCY A. BERRYHILL, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, REVERSING THE DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER'S DECISION THAT PLAINTIFF WAS NOT DISABLED AND, THEREFORE, NOT ENTITLED TO BENEFITS UNDER THE SOCIAL SECURITY ACT, AND REMANDING THE CAPTIONED CAUSE PURSUANT TO THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS OPINION; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 3/1/2018. (srb) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 01/30 2:57 PM
OBJECTION to10 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Brian L. Horst. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/17 11:13 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT: (1) THE ALJ'S NON-DISABILITY FINDING BE FOUND SUPPORTED BY SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENCE, AND AFFIRMED; AND (2) THIS CASE BE CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/17/2018. (srb) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Reply to Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Fri 06/30 2:45 PM
REPLY to Opposition re7 Statement of Specific Errors by Plaintiff Brian L. Horst (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Fri 06/16 3:59 PM
Response in Opposition re7 Statement of Specific Errors by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Reply to Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 7/3/2017. (Lewis, Ameenah) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Specific Errors
Tue 05/02 9:04 AM
STATEMENT OF SPECIFIC ERRORS by Plaintiff Brian L. Horst Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 6/16/2017. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 03/21 8:59 AM
NOTATION ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to comply with the provisions set forth in the Seventh Amended Magistrate Judge's General Order No. 11 (effective 4/26/16). General Order No. 11 can be found at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/content/general-orders-ohio-southern-district. Specifically, the parties are directed to paragraph 2 that requires citations to the PageID in the administrative record. Further, prior to filing a memorandum in opposition, the Commissioner shall determine whether remand is appropriate and, if so, shall file a motion for remand in lieu of a memorandum in opposition. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/21/2017. (cg) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certified Administrative Record - SSA Cases Only
Mon 03/20 10:34 AM
First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 5/4/2017. (Stark, John) |
|
Att: 1 court transcript index, | ||
Att: 2 documents related to administrative process, | ||
Att: 3 payment documents and decisions, | ||
Att: 4 juridictional documents and notices, | ||
Att: 5 non disability related development, | ||
Att: 6 disability related development, | ||
Att: 7 medical records part 1, | ||
Att: 8 medical records part 2, | ||
Att: 9 medical records part 3 | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/07 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ameenah Lewis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Lewis, Ameenah) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 02/02 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/19/2017, answer due 3/20/2017. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 01/17 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of General Counsel (jmb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Brian L. Horst ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5800738), filed by Brian L. Horst. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Form |