Cooper v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sharon L Ovington |
Referred: | Sharon L Ovington |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00014 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Interested Party
SSA
|
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Cooper
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 07/10 2:55 PM
DECISION AND ENTRY - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. The Parties Joint Stipulation for an Award of Attorneys Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (Doc. #17 ) is accepted and the Commissioner shall pay Plaintiffs attorney fees, costs, and expenses in the total amount of $4,608.50; 2. Counsel for the parties shall verify, within thirty days of this Decision and Entry, whether or not Plaintiff owes a preexisting debt to the United States subject to offset. If no such pre-existing debt exists, Defendant shall pay the EAJA award directly to Plaintiff's counsel pursuant to the EAJA assignment signed by Plaintiff; 3. Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees (Doc. #16 ) is denied as moot; and 4. The case remains terminated on the docket of this Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 7/10/2018. (srb) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/09 4:12 PM
STIPULATION to fees under the EAJA by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Schepard, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 06/26 4:08 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees under Equal Access to Justic Act by Plaintiff Joshua Cooper. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed EAJA Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Time Entries, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 03/28 10:49 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/28/2018. (srb) |
|
14 | 14
22
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/28 10:45 AM
DECISION AND ENTRY - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. The Commissioners non-disability finding is vacated; 2. No finding is made as to whether Plaintiff Joshua Cooper was under a disability within the meaning of the Social Security Act; 3. This matter is REMANDED to the Social Security Administration under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further consideration consistent with this Decision and Entry; and 4. The case is terminated on the Courts docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 3/28/2018. (srb) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Reply to Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Tue 08/22 10:42 AM
REPLY to Opposition re6 Statement of Specific Errors by Plaintiff Joshua Cooper (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Wed 08/16 5:39 PM
Response in Opposition re6 Statement of Specific Errors by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Reply to Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 8/31/2017. (Schepard, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/25 5:16 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE - Upon unanimous consent of the parties, memorialized in their Joint Consent of the Parties to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 10), the above captioned action is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington for all further proceedings herein, including trial, the entry of judgment, and all post-trial proceedings. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 7/25/17. (pb) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Joint Consent to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge Form
Mon 07/24 11:37 AM
JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Schepard, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order
Tue 07/18 9:06 AM
NOTATION ORDER: Granting9 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 8/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 7/18/2017. (lek) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 07/17 11:20 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 8/16/2017. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Schepard, Eric) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order
Mon 06/19 9:10 AM
NOTATION ORDER: Granting8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6/19/2017. (lek) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 06/16 11:08 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 7/17/2017. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Schepard, Eric) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/16 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Schepard for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Schepard, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Specific Errors
Tue 05/02 10:12 AM
STATEMENT OF SPECIFIC ERRORS by Plaintiff Joshua Cooper Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 6/16/2017. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certified Administrative Record - SSA Cases Only
Fri 03/24 10:28 AM
First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 5/8/2017. (Stark, John) |
|
Att: 1 court transcript index, | ||
Att: 2 documents related to administrative process, | ||
Att: 3 payment documents and decisions, | ||
Att: 4 jurisdictional documents and notices, | ||
Att: 5 non disability related development, | ||
Att: 6 disability related development, | ||
Att: 7 medical records part 1, | ||
Att: 8 medical records part 2, | ||
Att: 9 medical records part 3, | ||
Att: 10 medical records part 4 | ||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 01/30 9:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/23/2017, answer due 3/24/2017. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 01/18 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Joshua Cooper. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/18 8:58 AM
NOTATION ORDER: Granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/18/2017. (lek) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/17 9:56 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua Cooper. (Blumenthal, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Form |