Quigley v. National Truck Funding, LLC
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Barbour, Jr |
Referred: | John C Gargiulo |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00029 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 4:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
National Truck Funding, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Quigley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Change Venue
Thu 03/16 2:21 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the above styled and numbered cause to the Southern Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi, with new judges to be assigned. Signed by District Judge William H. Barbour, Jr on 3/16/17. (TLC) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Thu 03/16 3:38 PM
Intradistrict Transfer to Southern Division - Case Number 1:17cv78 LG-RHW. (TLC) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/13 1:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by National Truck Funding, LLC.(Watkins, Jason) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Change Venue
Fri 03/10 4:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern Division of this Court by National Truck Funding, LLC (Watkins, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 02/08 8:53 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleading. National Truck Funding, LLC's deadline for filing a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is now March 13, 2017. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 2/8/2017 (HM) |
||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 02/07 2:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by National Truck Funding, LLC (Watkins, Jason) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/23 1:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Quigley National Truck Funding, LLC served on 1/20/2017, answer due 2/10/2017. (Watson, Louis) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/17 11:13 AM
Summons Issued as to National Truck Funding, LLC. (RRL) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against National Truck Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643043032), filed by Maria Quigley. [Jury Demand](RRL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Charge of Discrimination, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Notice of Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |