Koudsi, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin R Barash |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10116 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Debtor
Koudsi, Inc., debtor
5319 Van Nuys Blvd
Sherman Oaks, CA 91401-5620 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
David Seror (TR)
21650 Oxnard Street, Suite 500
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/18/2017 12:01 AM PST |
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 01/17 3:08 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(1:17-bk-10116) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44053863. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Tue 01/17 3:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/21/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. (Kogan, Michael) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 01/17 3:06 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Koudsi, Inc. (Kogan, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Tue 01/17 3:12 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Koudsi, Inc.. (Kogan, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing (DeBN)
Tue 01/17 3:13 PM
Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing (DeBN) Filed by Debtor Koudsi, Inc.. (Kogan, Michael) |