McClure Property Development, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Peter Carroll |
Case #: | 9:17-bk-10083 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Debtor
McClure Property Development, Inc.
4864 Market St Ste E
Ventura, CA 93003-5786 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jeremy W. Faith (TR)
16030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 470
Encino, CA 91436 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/18/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 01/17 7:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:17-bk-10083) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44056073. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Tue 01/17 7:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/06/2017 at 10:00 AM at 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Mansfield, Andrew) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 01/17 7:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by McClure Property Development, Inc. (Mansfield, Andrew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Tue 01/17 7:54 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor McClure Property Development, Inc.. (Mansfield, Andrew) |