General Capacitor International Inc. et al v. Zhong
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Haywood S Gilliam, Jr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00179 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:34 AM PDT |
Counter-claimant
Linda Zhong
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
General Capacitor Co. Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
General Capacitor International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
General Capacitor, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Linda Zhong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
General Capacitor Co. Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
General Capacitor International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
General Capacitor, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
minutes
Case Management Conference - Further
Tue 02/28 4:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/28/2017. FTR Time 2:18-2:33.Total Time in Court: 15 Minutes. Plaintiff Attorney Perry Narancic. Defendant Attorney Michael W. Battin appearing via CourtCall ; George Conwell, Jr. appearing via courtcall. The Court orders that the cases be consolidated for all pretrial purposes. The Court advises the parties that the case will be referred to a Magistrate Judge for discovery. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding a revised proposed case schedule and e-file a stipulation and proposed order proposing a revised case schedule within 10 days from today.This is a text only Minute Entry (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2017) |
|
47 | 47
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/28 12:07 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by G. Donovan Conwell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11191176.) filed by General Capacitor Co. Ltd, General Capacitor International, Inc., General Capacitor, LLC.(Narancic, Perry) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Tue 02/21 11:08 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by General Capacitor Co. Ltd, General Capacitor International, Inc., General Capacitor, LLC. (Narancic, Perry) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/21 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Perry J. Narancic (Narancic, Perry) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
44 | 44
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Tue 02/21 9:54 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
43 | 43
motion
Appear by Telephone
Tue 02/21 7:17 AM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Linda Zhong.(Battin, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 02/17 11:08 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs byLinda Zhong.(Battin, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 02/07 4:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for February 14, 2017, is continued to February 28, 2017, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 21, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Tue 02/07 11:49 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Appear by Telephone
Tue 02/07 7:20 AM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Linda Zhong.(Battin, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 02/03 9:41 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, filed by Linda Zhong. (Battin, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 02/02 9:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 14, 2017, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 7, 2017. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/01 12:19 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr.35 Judge Hon. Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 01/31 8:56 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Florida counsel filed by Linda Zhong. Responses due by 2/14/2017. Replies due by 2/21/2017.(Battin, Michael) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order Relating Case
Fri 01/27 1:55 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-2458-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/27/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Wed 01/25 12:32 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case to re 16-cv-2458-HSG, Enertrode, Inc. v. General Capacitor Co. Ltd. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/25/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 01/17 12:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE clarifying that the Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 4/4/2017 is vacated and has been advanced to 2/14/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
32 | 32
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 01/17 12:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
31 | 31
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/17 9:03 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco.(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/17 9:00 AM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:16-cv-00265. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 1/17/2017 (farS, COURT STAFF). |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
29 | 29 ORDER GRANTING 4 MOTION TO TRANSFER. The Clerk shall take all steps necessary to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/12/2017. (tdl) | |
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28 REPLY by LINDA ZHONG re26 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines/Hearings,27 Response to Order to Show Cause . (BURHANS, GLENN) | |
Att: 1 Errata A | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
27 | 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GENERAL CAPACITOR CO LTD, GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL INC, GENERAL CAPACITOR LLC. (CONWELL, GEORGE) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Davis George Moye | ||
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER DIRECTING FILING - (Show Cause Response due by 1/9/2017 , at 5:00 PM, Defendant may file a response by 1/11/2017 .) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/4/2017. (tdl) | |
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER by LINDA ZHONG re22 Order Staying Case, (BURHANS, GLENN) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Order | ||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
24 | 24 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re ECF No. 22 - The parties are still to notify this Court within seven days of the Northern District of California's decision. (Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 3/9/2017 .) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/6/2016. (tdl) | |
23 | 23 ORAL ORDER directing Clerk to terminate 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California. Ordered by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/6/16. (pll) | |
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING DECISION FROM THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA - This case is STAYED pending a decision from the Northern District of California. The parties are directed to file a status report with this Court within seven (7) days of the Northern District of California's decision. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/9/2016. Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 12/9/2016 . (tdl) | |
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER GRANTING ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME re ECF No. 19 . The motion is granted, nunc pro tunc to July 26, 2016. The sur-reply will be accepted as filed. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/27/2016. (tdl) | |
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
20 | 20 SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO4 MOTION TO TRANSFER re19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL INC. (CONWELL, GEORGE) Modified on 7/27/2016 to edit text(kdm). | |
19 | 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply /Sur-Reply Pursuant to Dkt. 17 by GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL INC. (CONWELL, GEORGE) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Judith Nelson | ||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
18 | 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION for Leave to File re4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California ,15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, ,4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California filed by LINDA ZHONG. (BURHANS, GLENN) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit California Plaintiff Opp to MTD | ||
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 LEAVE TO FILE REPLY AND SURREPLY. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/14/2016. (tdl) | |
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION for Leave to File re4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California ,15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by LINDA ZHONG. (BURHANS, GLENN) | |
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California filed by GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL INC. (CONWELL, GEORGE) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Jianping Zheng in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Davis George Moye in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer | ||
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER ADMITTING MICHAEL W. BATTIN PRO HAC VICE - Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. 13 , is GRANTED and Michael W. Battin is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant. ECF No. 11 is DENIED as moot. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/30/2016. (cle) | |
13 | 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael W. Battin.( Filing fee $ 196 receipt number AFLNDC-3615841.) by LINDA ZHONG. (BATTIN, MICAHEL) | |
12 | 12 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney Battin - re:11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is advised by this entry, that Doc.11 contains only a receipt of payment for this motion. The actual motion is not attached. Please re-file your motion. Once it has been re-file the court will address it. (cle) | |
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Battin.( Filing fee $ 196 receipt number AFLNDC-3614642.) by LINDA ZHONG. (BATTIN, MICAHEL) | |
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
10 | 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL INC. Plaintiff's Amended Certificate of Good Faith to Their Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer and Memorandum of Law . (CONWELL, GEORGE) | |
9 | 9 ORDER GRANTING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO TRANSFER - re: 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the motion to transfer on or before 7/8/2016 . Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/9/2016. (cle) | |
8 | 8 RESPONSE to Motion re7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California filed by LINDA ZHONG. (BURHANS, GLENN) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit E-Mail re Voice Message, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Filing | ||
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California by GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL INC. (CONWELL, GEORGE) | |
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING DETERMINATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER. Defendant's motion to stay, ECF No. 5 , is GRANTED. Except for consideration of the motion to transfer, ECF No. 4 , this action is STAYED until a ruling on the motion to transfer is issued or the stay is lifted by separate order. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/26/2016. (cle) | |
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Stay re4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California by LINDA ZHONG. (BURHANS, GLENN) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - California Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Zhong Declaration | ||
4 | 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to to the Northern District of California by LINDA ZHONG. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/8/2016) . (BURHANS, GLENN) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 California Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Zhong Declaration | ||
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to LINDA ZHONG. (amm) | |
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (amm) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT The Plaintiffs, GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL, INC., GENERAL CAPACITOR, LLC and GENERAL CAPACITOR CO. LTD. sue Defendant, Linda Zhong against All Plaintiffs, filed by GENERAL CAPACITOR INTERNATIONAL INC. (CONWELL, LEWIS) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |