Campbell v. 992 Peralta LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00189 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
992 Peralta LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Arlene Campbell
1388 Haight Street, #8
San Francisco, CA 94117 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Bldg Inspection
Terminated: 02/24/2017
|
|
Defendant
Planning Dept
Terminated: 02/24/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/11 4:31 PM
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 7 Motion for an Order to Show Cause.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/28 1:38 PM
MOTION for an order to show cause, arbitration, fraud, selling the art lofts as vacant land, misunderstanding on both parties filed by Arlene Campbell. Responses due by 4/7/2017. Replies due by 4/14/2017.(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 attacking sentence, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/09 5:29 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/9/17.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 02/27 11:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 992 Peralta LLC. Filed byArlene Campbell. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/25 12:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2017.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/17 2:25 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2017 02:00 PM.(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/17 2:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Arlene Campbell. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Arlene Campbell. Filed byArlene Campbell.(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |