J. Jason Reynolds v. Direct Flow Medical, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00204 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Yuval Binur
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gordon Bishop
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John David Boyle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Direct Flow Medical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul LaViolette
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dan Lemaitre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Jason Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Direct Flow (Assignment for the Benefit of Creditors), LLC
Terminated: 07/03/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
84 | 84
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 03/13 1:16 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 83 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
83 | 83
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 03/06 8:38 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL filed by Yuval Binur, Gordon Bishop, John David Boyle, Direct Flow Medical, Inc., Paul LaViolette, Dan Lemaitre.(Gomes, Allan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration |