Biscotti Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:17-mc-80010 |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
|
|
Miscellaneous
AMAZON.COM,INC.
|
|
Miscellaneous
Twitch Interactive, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Biscotti Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 04/19 1:13 PM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Compel. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Mon 02/27 11:27 AM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 14 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Discharging 16 Order to Show Cause. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/15 10:08 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Twitch Interactive, Inc. .(Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov In Support of Biscotti, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov In Response to Order to Show Cause | ||
17 | 17
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Wed 02/15 9:32 PM
Declaration of SAINA S. SHAMILOV in Support of14 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTwitch Interactive, Inc.. (Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/15 3:03 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/15/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Fri 02/03 8:17 PM
REPLY Twitch to Produce Documents and Testimony filed byBiscotti Inc..(Alper, Adam) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 8 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Fri 02/03 8:11 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Biscotti Inc..(Alper, Adam) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Redacted Version of Reply, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Reply, | ||
Att: 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Thu 02/02 5:33 PM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 01/30 7:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitch Interactive, Inc. re11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, the Declarations of Saina S. Shamilov and Kevin Yung in Support Thereof, and Accompanying Proposed (Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Mon 01/30 2:38 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, the Declarations of Saina S. Shamilov and Kevin Yung in Support Thereof, and Accompanying Proposed Order filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc..(Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Redacted Version of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 5 Redacted Version of [Proposed] Order Denying Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 6 Unredacted Version of [Proposed] Order Denying Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 7 Redacted Version of Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 8 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Redacted Version of Declaration of Kevin Yung in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 16 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Kevin Yung in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel | ||
Saturday, January 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Sat 01/28 12:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitch Interactive, Inc. re9 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Order Denying Biscotti, Inc.s Motion to Compel Twitch Interactive, Inc. to Produce Documents and Testimony Pursuant to Plaintiffs Subpoena Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 ,7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, the Declarations of Saina S. Shamilov and Kevin Yung in Support Thereof, and Accompanying Proposed (Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/28/2017) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Fri 01/27 11:58 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Order Denying Biscotti, Inc.s Motion to Compel Twitch Interactive, Inc. to Produce Documents and Testimony Pursuant to Plaintiffs Subpoena Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc..(Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion To File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Redacted Version of Order Denying Biscotti, Inc.s Motion to Compel Twitch Interactive, Inc. to Produce Documents and Testimony Pursuant to Plaintiffs Subpoena Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Unredacted Version of Order Denying Biscotti, Inc.s Motion to Compel Twitch Interactive, Inc. to Produce Documents and Testimony Pursuant to Plaintiffs Subpoena Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 01/27 11:50 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byTwitch Interactive, Inc..(Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.s Opposition to Biscottis Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 22 Declaration of Kevin Yung in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.s Opposition to Biscottis Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 23 Proposed Order Denying Biscotti, Inc.s Motion to Compel Twitch Interactive, Inc. to Produce Documents and Testimony Pursuant to Plaintiffs Subpoena Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Fri 01/27 11:41 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, the Declarations of Saina S. Shamilov and Kevin Yung in Support Thereof, and Accompanying Proposed Order Under Seal filed by Twitch Interactive, Inc..(Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion To File Under Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Redacted Version of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti, Inc.'s Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 13 Redacted Version of Declaration of Kevin Yung in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 14 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Kevin Yung in Support of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc.'s Opposition to Biscotti's Motion to Compel | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 01/27 10:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Twitch Interactive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AMAZON.COM,INC. for Twitch Interactive, Inc.. (Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/27 10:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Elizabeth Turner on behalf of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Turner, Shannon) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/27 10:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Saina Sason Shamilov on behalf of Non-Party Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 1/27/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 4:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biscotti Inc. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 01/17 4:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Biscotti Inc. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Compel
Tue 01/17 4:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Twitch to Produce Documents and Testimony filed by Biscotti Inc.. Responses due by 1/27/2017. Replies due by 2/3/2017. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |