US Bank National Association et al v. Villa Vecchio Ct Trust et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00143 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jan 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Absolute Collection Services, LLC
6440 Sky Pointe Drive 140 - 154
Las Vegas, NV 89131 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Foothills at Southern Highlands Homeowners Association
|
|
Defendant
Villa Vecchio Ct Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
US Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
3883 Howard Hughes Parkway Suite 1100
Las Vegas, NV 89169 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, January 09, 2024 | ||
121 | 121
order
Judgment
Tue 01/09 5:05 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiffs, US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and against Defendant, Villa Vecchio Ct Trust. Case closed. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
120 | 120
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/09 4:58 PM
ORDER. It is therefore ordered that Vecchio's105 motion for summary judgment is denied. It is further ordered that Vecchio's 106 motion to reopen discovery is denied. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs' 107 motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordinglyin Plaintiffs' favor and against Vecchioand close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |