Acclaim Lighting, Inc. v. Bruck et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00147 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Robert Bruck
3115 Foothill Blvd., Suite M213
La Crescenta, CA 91214 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruck Concepts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Acclaim Lighting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
77 | 77
misc
AO 120 Patent Trademark Report
Tue 01/15 3:51 PM
AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM) |
|
76 | 76
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/15 3:26 PM
ORDER granting75 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
75 | 75
motion
Stipulation Dismissal
Mon 01/14 2:33 PM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Acclaim Lighting, Inc.. (Krieger, John) |