Royse v. Barron et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00151 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 1:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lauren Barron
|
|
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Royse
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case
Wed 02/08 9:02 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.6 Stipulation to Remand to the Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada. This matter is remanded to the Eighth Judicial District Court. Each party to bear its own fees and costs (certified copy of Order and Docket Sheet mailed to Eighth Judicial District Court). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 02/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation
Tue 02/07 1:38 PM
STIPULATION and Order to Remand to the Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois. (Green, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
minord
Minute Order
Thu 01/19 12:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 1/19/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1
Wed 01/18 1:35 PM
(1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Rikki Hevrin is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) |
|
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Wed 01/18 10:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 1/18/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/2/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 01/17 5:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois added. . (Green, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Tue 01/17 5:00 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-16-744316-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4439046), filed by Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois. Proof of service due by 12/28/2016.(Green, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 01/18 10:31 AM
Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MMM) |