Kinsman v. Naphcare, Inc. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00152 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Kinsman
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Clark County Detention Center
Terminated: 02/22/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Naphcare, Inc.
Terminated: 03/22/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Costs Taxed
Mon 05/14 3:44 PM
COSTS TAXED in amount of $756.60 against Plaintiff re39 Bill of Costs. (AF) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Bill of Costs
Thu 03/29 1:14 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 4/12/2018. Tax Bill of Costs by 4/19/2018. (Couchot, Chad) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment
Fri 03/16 11:16 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
37 | 37
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 03/16 11:12 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that29 the Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in the defendants' favor and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 02/26 5:39 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing re:32 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff held on 2/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Crtrm Administrator: A. Caytuero ; Pla Counsel: Paul W. VanDerwerken, Esq. ; Def Counsel: Chad Couchot, Esq. ; Time of Hearing: 9:57 AM - 9:59 AM ; Recording start and end times: 9:57:31 - 9:59:48 ; Courtroom: 3C ; Plaintiff is present, via telephonic appearance, with counsel. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears the representations of counsel as to32 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that32 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff is GRANTED. Attorney Paul W VanDerwerken is withdrawn from this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Donald Kinsman will have until Wednesday, March 28, 2018 , to either retain new counsel, who must file a Notice of Appearance in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice, or to file a Notice of Intent to proceed Pro Se. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Fri 02/09 10:31 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Couchot, Chad) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/29 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for33 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Plaintiff Donald Kinsman. (VanDerwerken, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Mon 01/29 8:41 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing on32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. No later than January 31, 2018, Plaintiff's current counsel shall serve Plaintiff with this order and shall file a proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Motion Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/26 1:53 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Paul W. VanDerwerken for Plaintiff Donald Kinsman. (VanDerwerken, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 09/26 2:19 PM
REPLY to Response to29 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Couchot, Chad) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 09/12 11:02 AM
RESPONSE to29 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Donald Kinsman. Replies due by 9/26/2017.(VanDerwerken, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 08/23 4:29 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Responses due by 9/13/2017.(Couchot, Chad) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Wed 06/28 1:47 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Substitute Attorney Chad C. Couchot. Attorney Lyssa S Anderson and Ryan W. Daniels terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Substitute Attorney
Tue 06/27 2:12 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Couchot, Chad) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 06/22 2:32 PM
ORDER denying25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Substitute Attorney
Wed 06/21 12:06 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Couchot, Chad) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 05/05 11:48 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re19 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation re Discovery Matters
Thu 05/04 2:14 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re19 Scheduling Order, ; by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 03/22 10:37 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Dismiss Claims against Naphcare. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/09 12:00 PM
REPLY to Response NOTICE of Non-Opposition to15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Naphcare, Inc.. (Doyle, Thomas) Modified docket text to reflect correct event on 3/9/2017 (DKJ) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Fri 02/24 8:44 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (JM) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 02/24 8:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting18 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/24/2017. Motions due by 8/23/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Wed 02/22 3:33 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department . (Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/22 1:30 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against the Clark County Detention Center are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on this motion, scheduled for 3/20/17 at 3:00 p.m., is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 02/21 12:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Naphcare, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent NAPHCARE US, INC. for Naphcare, Inc. added. . (Doyle, Thomas) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss
Tue 02/21 11:53 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or NRS 41A.071 by Defendant Naphcare, Inc.. Responses due by 3/7/2017.(Doyle, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice: Attorney Action Required
Tue 02/21 11:24 AM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to12 -1 Attachment, "Disclosure Statement" to Joinder. ERROR: Document should have been filed as a separate entry. CORRECTION: Attorney Thomas Doyle is advised to refile the Disclosure Statement as a separate entry using the "Certificate of Interested Parties" event, located under the "Other Documents" category and add any Corporate Parents and/or Other Affiliates. (no image attached) (DKJ) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 02/21 11:12 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Donald Kinsman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (VanDerwerken, Paul) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joinder
Fri 02/17 1:51 PM
JOINDER to1 Petition for Removal,, ; filed by Defendant Naphcare, Inc..(Doyle, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Disclosure Statement | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report in Removal Case
Fri 02/17 8:30 AM
STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendants Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 02/02 2:20 PM
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL; filed by Defendants Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department.(Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 02/01 11:35 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department . (Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 01/30 2:37 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Defendant Clark County Detention Center's Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Responses due by 2/13/2017. (Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Fri 01/27 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on6 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2017 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Mon 01/23 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Clark County Detention Center. Responses due by 2/6/2017. (Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/23 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/9/2017.(Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1
Wed 01/18 10:20 AM
NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 5-1(b) that Lyssa Anderson, is in violation of Local Rule LR IC 5-1(b) re3 Certificate of Interested parties. The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No action is required at this time. Attorney advised in the future to file documents in accordance with Local Rules governing Electronic Case Filing. (no image attached) (DKJ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 01/18 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
2 | 2
minord
Minute Order re Removal - FORM
Wed 01/18 8:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 1/18/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/2/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Removal
Tue 01/17 7:34 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-16-748283-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4439196), filed by Clark County Detention Center, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Proof of service due by 3/16/2017.(Anderson, Lyssa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A3, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 01/18 8:44 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM) |