Carmichael v. Aranas et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | William G Cobb |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00025 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
103 | 103
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 09/23 8:47 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable 'Paroled' re NEF re ECF No.102 Transcript filed, sent to Richard Lee Carmichael at NNCC. (DRM) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
102 | 102
misc
Transcript
Thu 09/22 4:42 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings,40 Motion Hearing,,,,,,, held on 3-27-17, before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, KF@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/23/2022. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/21/2022. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KF) |