Wilson v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBA II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronny-Marie Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 03/31 12:46 PM
STIPULATION for dismissal of entire action filed by Ronny-Marie Wilson. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 3/31/2017) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/20 10:53 AM
ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 18 Notice of Settlement of Entire Action filed by Ronny-Marie Wilson. Dismissal or Statement due by 5/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 11:31 AM
NOTICE by Ronny-Marie Wilson of Settlement of Entire Action (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 3/16/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 03/02 10:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING REASSIGNMENT. The deadlines set by the4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act and10 ORDER GRANTING re8 Stipulation to Extend Time, remain as previously set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/01 10:33 AM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/17.(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Tue 02/28 10:04 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Tue 02/28 8:45 AM
PLEASE DISREGARD. WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED. DOCUMENT REFILED CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) Modified on 2/28/2017 (klhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 02/28 10:05 AM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:14 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. See15 for correct document. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/27 5:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronny-Marie Wilson.. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 02/27 7:51 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant PBA, II, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2017. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/24 9:31 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPBA II, LLC. (Busser, Norine) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 02/14 2:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING re 8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/14/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 02/13 2:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2017. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 02/13 8:53 AM
STIPULATION First Stipulation and Request to Extend time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Launey, Kristina) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/03 9:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronny-Marie Wilson. PBA II, LLC served on 1/30/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/02 8:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronny-Marie Wilson. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. served on 1/23/2017, answer due 2/13/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/20 12:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., PBA II, LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Fri 01/20 12:42 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by the Executive Committee on 1/19/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/19 10:47 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/18 9:26 AM
Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/18 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DAMAGES, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (ADA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11081331.). Filed byRonny-Marie Wilson.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |